Ontario Power Generation (OPG) is an Ontario-based electricity generation company whose principal business is the generation and sale of electricity in Ontario. OPG's focus is on the efficient production and sale of electricity from its generating assets, while operating in a safe, open and environmentally responsible manner. OPG was created under the Business Corporations Act (Ontario) and is wholly owned by the Province of Ontario.
Tom Mitchell, President and Chief Executive Officer (CEO)
Address:
700 University Avenue, 19th Fl.
Toronto, ON M5G 1X6
Canada
Telephone number:
416-592-2121
Ontario Power Generation Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Ontario Power Generation Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Ontario Power Generation Inc. | 2024-05-08 | current |
Ontario Power Generation Inc. | 2009-01-30 | 2024-05-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Ken Hartwick | 2019-04-01 | Current |
Jeffrey Lyash | 2015-08-21 | 2019-04-01 |
Tom Mitchell | 2009-07-15 | 2015-08-21 |
Jim Hankinson | 2005-08-19 | 2009-07-15 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Veteran Affairs Canada, Minister's Office |
September 2001 to September 2003 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Western Economic Diversification, Policy Branch |
September 1997 to December 2000 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant-Western Canada
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
October 1995 to September 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant-Western Canada
Agriculture Canada, Minister's Office |
January 1993 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |