Mandated by the Province of Alberta and operating under the Post Secondary Learning Act (Alberta) the U of C provides post secondary education, research and community service through 16 Faculties, numerous institutes and centres and through a Continuing Education unit. The U of C collaborates with industry and other education providers in providing both undergraduate and graduate education and life-long learning opportunities. The U of C also accepts international students and engages in international activities in connection with the above. Enterprise revenue, including research commercialization, and corporate and individual fundraising, augments government revenue sources.
Elizabeth Cannon, President & Vice-Chancellor
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Research Chairs | $8,533,333.00 | Yes |
Canadian Foundation for Innovation | $10,199,090.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $25,579,191.99 | Yes |
Foreign | $23,947,685.01 | Yes |
Health Canada | $245,201.78 | Yes |
Municipal | $400,412.13 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $35,468,249.39 | Yes |
Other Federal | $8,177,784.00 | Yes |
Other Provinces | $3,848,422.00 | Yes |
Provincial | $599,759,056.24 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $5,699,928.12 | Yes |
Address:
2500 University Drive
Calgary, AB T2N 1N4
Canada
Telephone number:
403-220-5617
Fax number:
403-289-6800
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
University of Calgary | 2024-04-16 | current |
University of Calgary | 2008-08-22 | 2024-04-16 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Edward McCauley | 2019-01-01 | Current |
Elizabeth Cannon | 2010-07-01 | 2019-01-01 |
Dr. Harvey Weingarten | 2005-08-19 | 2010-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
February 2004 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
National Youth and Internship Coordinator
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
October 2002 to February 2004 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Constituency Office of Rob Anders, MP |
October 2002 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Coordinator
House of Commons, Constituency Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
January 2001 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Research Intern
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
May 2000 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Intern
House of Commons, Constituency Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
May 1999 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Intern
House of Commons, Constituency Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
May 1998 to August 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Veteran's Affairs, Minister's Office |
2002 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor
Science, Research and Development, Secretary of State |
2002 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Industry, Minister's Office |
2001 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Parliament of Canada, John Harvard, MP |
1996 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Project Manager
Statistics Canada, Census Division |
1996 to 1996 | Not a designated office |