CIBC is a leading North American financial institution. Through our two distinct business lines, CIBC Retail Markets and CIBC World Markets, CIBC provides a full range of products and services to almost 11 million individual and small business clients. CIBC has over 39,000 employees. As of October 31, 2007 CIBC has 1,048 branches and 3,700 automated banking machines across the country. CIBC contributed more than $27 million in communities across Canada.
Gerry McCaughey, President & Chief Executive Officer (CEO)
Address:
COMMERCE COURT WEST 56
TORONTO, ON M5L 1A2
Canada
Telephone number:
416-956-3311
Fax number:
416-861-3757
CANADIAN IMPERIAL BANK OF COMMERCE ( CIBC) is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CANADIAN IMPERIAL BANK OF COMMERCE ( CIBC) | 2024-04-01 | current |
CANADIAN IMPERIAL BANK OF COMMERCE ( CIBC) | 2008-08-11 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Victor Dodig | 2014-09-15 | Current |
Gerry McCaughey | 2005-08-17 | 2014-09-15 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Office of the Speaker |
November 2004 to June 2008 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Canada Revenue Agency, Regulatory Reform Secretariat, Charities Directorate |
September 2003 to November 2004 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Hon. Peter Milliken, M.P. |
May 2000 to August 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Departmental Secretary
Finance Canada, Office of the Deputy Minister |
July 1986 to May 1987 | Not a designated office |
Departmental Assistant
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister |
September 1984 to July 1986 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Finance Canada, International Programs Division |
May 1983 to September 1984 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Finance Canada, International Economic Relations |
July 1981 to April 1983 | Not a designated office |