Since 1871, Scotiabank has been a chartered bank under the Bank Act in Canada. The Bank and its subsidiaries provide a full range of banking and related financial services including personal, commercial, corporate and investment banking services through a network of branches and offices in all the provinces and territories outside Canada. The Bank has branches and offices in some 50 countries which provide a wide range of banking and related financial services either directly or through subsidiary and associated banks, trust companies and other financial firms.
Brian Porter, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
6-40 King Street W.
PC&GA
Toronto, ON M5H 1H1
Canada
Telephone number:
416-866-3703
Scotiabank / Banque Scotia is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Scotiabank/Banque Scotia | 2024-05-06 | current |
Scotiabank/Banque Scotia | 2008-07-29 | 2024-05-06 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Scott Thomson | 2023-03-01 | Current |
Brian Porter | 2013-11-01 | 2023-03-01 |
Richard Waugh | 2005-08-19 | 2013-11-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Trade Policy Officer
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Trade Branch |
January 2009 to October 2012 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant - Tour and Operations
Office of the Prime Minister, Tour and Operations |
August 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant - Ontario
Heritage Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant- Ontario and Western Canada
Agriculture Canada, Office of the Secretary of State (Rural Development) |
March 2003 to January 2004 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Affairs Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Art Eggleton, MP |
March 2001 to March 2003 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Affairs Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Roy Cullen, MP |
April 2000 to March 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Finance, Minister's Office |
July 2010 to August 2013 | August 13, 2013 |
Deputy Chief of Staff and Director of Policy
Finance Canada, Minister's Office |
November 2008 to June 2010 | June 30, 2010 |
Policy Advisor
Finance Canada, Minister's Office |
January 2006 to October 2008 | October 31, 2008 |