Transat A.T. Inc. est une société intégrée de transport aérien (par l'entremise de sa filiale Air Transat) et de voyages. Transat A.T. Inc. is a vertically-integrated concern specializing in air transport through its airline subsidiary Air Transat, and in the organization, marketing and distribution of travel products and services.
Annick Guérard, President & Chief Executive Officer
Address:
Place du Parc
300 Leo-Pariseau, suite 600
Montreal, QC H2X 4C2
Canada
Telephone number:
514-987-1660
Transat A.T. Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Transat A.T. Inc. | 2024-06-13 | current |
Transat A.T. Inc. | 2008-08-06 | 2024-06-13 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Annick Guérard | 2021-05-27 | Current |
Jean-Marc Eustache | 2005-08-11 | 2021-05-27 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant and Chief of Staff to the Hon. Irwin Cotler
House of Commons, Member of Parliament for Mount-Royal |
September 2004 to April 2015 | Not a designated office |