Dairy Farmers of Canada (DFC) is the national lobby, policy and promotion organization representing all dairy producers in Canada. The main objective of DFC is to promote the interests of producers by coordinationg the actions of dairy producer organizations on all issues of national scope and collaborating with relevant agencies in the elboration of national policies affecting the Canadian dairy industry. The promotional objective is to increase the sale sof dairy products to the financial benefit of producers and the health benefit of consumers.
RICHARD DOYLE, EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR
Address:
21 Florence St.
Ottawa, ON K2P 0W6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-236-9997
Fax number:
613-236-0905
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Dairy Farmers of Canada/Les Producteurs laitiers du Canada | 2024-04-04 | current |
Dairy Farmers of Canada/Les Producteurs laitiers du Canada | 2008-07-02 | 2024-04-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jacques Lefebvre | 2018-01-17 | Current |
PAMELA HARROD | 2017-07-18 | 2018-01-17 |
Caroline Emond | 2015-01-23 | 2017-07-18 |
Sylvie Larose | 2014-10-24 | 2015-01-23 |
ROSEMARY MacLELLAN | 2014-08-31 | 2014-10-24 |
RICHARD DOYLE | 1996-03-25 | 2014-08-31 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT/COMMUNICATIONS COORDINATOR
ENVIRONMENT CANADA, FINANCE & CORPORATE |
January 2009 to June 2009 | Not a designated office |
ADMINISTRATIVE ASSISTANT
CANADA REVENUE AGENCY, BUSINESS AND RETURNS PROCESSING |
May 2006 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
Office of the Solicitor General, House of Commons |
February 2002 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant, Parliamentary Affairs
Office of the Minister of Industry, House of Commons |
January 2001 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant, Legislative and Liaison
Office of the Leader of the Government in the Senate, Senate of Canada |
March 2000 to January 2001 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Senate of Canada, Senate of Canada |
February 1998 to March 2000 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Revenue Canada, Archival REcords Management |
July 1996 to September 1996 | Not a designated office |
Student volunteer
House of Commons, House of Commons |
September 1994 to March 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT/COMMUNICATIONS COORDINATOR
ENVIRONMENT CANADA, FINANCE & CORPORATE |
January 2009 to June 2009 | Not a designated office |
ADMINISTRATIVE ASSISTANT
CANADA REVENUE AGENCY, BUSINESS AND RETURNS PROCESSING |
May 2006 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research coordination
Agriculture and Agri-food Canada, Market Industry Service Branch (Ottawa) |
1991 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Research Coordination
Agriculture and Agri-food Canada (Ottawa), Research Branch |
1984 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Research Coordination
Agriculture and Agri-food Canada, Research Branch (Quebec) |
1982 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Research Coordination
Agriculture and Agri-food Canada, Research Branch |
1981 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Research Scientist
Agriculture and Agri-food Canada, Lennoxville Research Station |
1972 to 1980 | Not a designated office |