Dairy Farmers of Canada (DFC) is the national lobby, policy and promotion organization representing all dairy producers in Canada. The main objective of DFC is to promote the interests of producers by coordinationg the actions of dairy producer organizations on all issues of national scope and collaborating with relevant agencies in the elboration of national policies affecting the Canadian dairy industry. The promotional objective is to increase the sale sof dairy products to the financial benefit of producers and the health benefit of consumers.
Jacques Lefebvre, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
21 Florence St.
Ottawa, ON K2P 0W6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-232-7242
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Dairy Farmers of Canada/Les Producteurs laitiers du Canada | 2024-04-04 | current |
Dairy Farmers of Canada/Les Producteurs laitiers du Canada | 2008-07-02 | 2024-04-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jacques Lefebvre | 2018-01-17 | Current |
PAMELA HARROD | 2017-07-18 | 2018-01-17 |
Caroline Emond | 2015-01-23 | 2017-07-18 |
Sylvie Larose | 2014-10-24 | 2015-01-23 |
ROSEMARY MacLELLAN | 2014-08-31 | 2014-10-24 |
RICHARD DOYLE | 1996-03-25 | 2014-08-31 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
DIRECTOR GENERAL
PUBLIC SAFETY CANADA, PROGRAM DIRECTORATE |
June 2014 to November 2018 | Not a designated office |
DIRECTOR GENERAL
PUBLIC SAFETY CANADA, NATIONAL CRIME PREVENTION CENTRE |
December 2012 to June 2014 | Not a designated office |
DIRECTOR GENERAL
HUMAN RESOURCES & SKILLS DEVELOPMENT CANADA, CORPORATE PLANNING & ACCOUNTABILITY |
July 2009 to December 2012 | Not a designated office |
DIRECTOR GENERAL
HUMAN RESOURCES & SKILLS DEVELOPMENT CANADA, INTERNAL CONTROL & BUSINESS SERVICS |
November 2007 to June 2009 | Not a designated office |
EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR
AGRICULTURE & AGRI-FOOD CANADA, FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT & ACCOUNTABILITY |
September 2005 to October 2007 | Not a designated office |
ACTING DIRECTOR
AGRICULTURE & AGRI-FOOD CANADA, EXPENDITURE REVIEW COORDINATION |
June 2005 to September 2005 | Not a designated office |
DIRECTOR
AGRICULTURE & AGRI-FOOD CANADA, FOOD SAFETY AND QUALITY PROGRAMS |
January 2003 to May 2005 | Not a designated office |
MANAGER
AGRICULTURE & AGRI-FOOD CANADA, ADAPTATION IMPLEMENTATION |
June 2001 to December 2002 | Not a designated office |
ACTING CONTROLLER
AGRICULTURE & AGRI-FOOD CANADA, BUSINESS PLANNING & RISK MANAGMENT |
December 1999 to June 2000 | Not a designated office |
CHIEF
AGRICULTURE & AGRI-FOOD CANADA, RISK MANAGEMENT/FINANCE/TAXATION |
1993 to May 2001 | Not a designated office |
ES-O5
AGRICULTURE & AGRI-FOOD CANADA, PROGRAM DEVELOPMENT & ANALYSIS |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
LEGAL COUNSEL
DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, LEGAL SERVICES |
1982 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
April 2009 to September 2010 | Not a designated office |