Information and Communications Technology products and services
Bernard Courtois, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
220 Laurier Avenue West
Suite 1120
Ottawa, ON K1P 5Z9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-238-4822
Ext.
233
Fax number:
613-238-7967
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
TECHNATION Canada/ | 2024-03-31 | current |
TECHNATION Canada/ | 2020-06-03 | 2024-03-31 |
Information Technology Association of Canada/Association canadienne de la technologie de l'information | 2008-09-12 | 2020-06-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Angela Mondou | 2019-04-15 | Current |
Denise Shortt | 2018-11-01 | 2019-04-15 |
Robert Watson | 2016-04-18 | 2018-11-01 |
Karna Gupta | 2011-08-25 | 2016-04-18 |
Bernard Courtois | 2005-08-22 | 2011-08-25 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief, Treatment Benefits
Government of Canada, Veterans Affairs |
September 1980 to April 1990 | Not a designated office |