Suncor Energy Inc. is Canada’s premier integrated energy company. Suncor’s operations include oil sands development and upgrading, conventional and offshore oil and gas production, petroleum refining, and product marketing under the Petro-Canada brand – a proud National Partner to the Vancouver 2010 Olympic and Paralympic Winter Games. While working to responsibly develop petroleum resources, Suncor is also developing a growing renewable energy portfolio. Suncor’s common shares (symbol: SU) are listed on the Toronto and New York stock exchanges.
Richard George, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2008-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $0.00 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $0.00 | Yes |
Ontario Ministry of Agriculture, Food and Rural Affairs - Ontario Ethanol Growth Fund | $10,379,564.00 | Yes |
Address:
P.O. Box 38
112-4th Avenue S.W.
Calgary, AB T2P 2V5
Canada
Telephone number:
403-920-8897
Fax number:
403-269-6217
Suncor Energy Inc. / Suncor Énergie Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Suncor Energy Inc./Suncor Énergie Inc. | 2024-01-01 | current |
Suncor Energy Inc./Suncor Énergie Inc. | 2008-07-22 | 2024-01-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Richard Kruger | 2023-04-03 | Current |
Kris Smith | 2022-07-08 | 2023-04-03 |
Mark Little | 2019-05-02 | 2022-07-08 |
Steven Williams | 2012-05-01 | 2019-05-02 |
Richard George | 2005-08-04 | 2012-05-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Honourary Colonel
Canadian Forces, 409 Tactical Fighter Squadrons, 4 wing Airforce Base |
July 2006 to November 2007 | Not a designated office |
Honourary Colonel
Canadian Forces, 411 Tactical Fighter Squadrons, 4 wing Airforce Base |
2003 to November 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Co-op student
Energy, Mines and Resources, Mineral Processing Lab |
September 1977 to December 1977 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Honourary Colonel
Canadian Forces, 409 Tactical Fighter Squadrons, 4 wing Airforce Base |
July 2006 to November 2007 | Not a designated office |
Honourary Colonel
Canadian Forces, 411 Tactical Fighter Squadrons, 4 wing Airforce Base |
2003 to November 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Naval Officer
Canadian Forces, Navy |
1999 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Naval Officer
Canadian Forces, Navy |
1990 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Cadet
Canadian Forces, Royalty Military College |
1987 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Infratry Soldier
Canadian Forces, N/A |
1984 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Mail carrier / driver
Canada Post, N/A |
December 1977 to December 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer student
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Oceanographic survey |
May 1979 to October 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Second Lieutenant
Canadian Forces, Reserves |
September 1983 to December 1985 | Not a designated office |
Officer Cadet
Canadian Forces, Reserves |
1982 to September 1983 | Not a designated office |