Suncor Energy Inc. is Canada's premier integrated energy company. Suncor's operations include oil sands development and upgrading, conventional and offshore oil and gas production, petroleum refining, and product marketing under the Petro-Canada brand. While working to responsibly develop petroleum resources, Suncor is also developing a growing renewable energy portfolio. Suncor's common shares (symbol: SU) are listed on the Toronto and New York stock exchanges.
Richard George, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2010-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $0.00 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $27,280,255.00 | Yes |
Ontario Ministry of Agriculture, Food and Rural Affairs - Ontario Ethanol Growth Fund | $16,967,967.00 | Yes |
Address:
P.O. Box 2844
150 6 Ave SW
Calgary, AB T2P 3E3
Canada
Telephone number:
403-296-8000
Suncor Energy Inc. / Suncor Énergie Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Suncor Energy Inc./Suncor Énergie Inc. | 2024-01-01 | current |
Suncor Energy Inc./Suncor Énergie Inc. | 2008-07-22 | 2024-01-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Richard Kruger | 2023-04-03 | Current |
Kris Smith | 2022-07-08 | 2023-04-03 |
Mark Little | 2019-05-02 | 2022-07-08 |
Steven Williams | 2012-05-01 | 2019-05-02 |
Richard George | 2005-08-04 | 2012-05-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Mail carrier / driver
Canada Post, N/A |
December 1977 to December 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer student
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Oceanographic survey |
May 1979 to October 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Staffer
House of Commons, Office of John English, Member of Parliament |
1994 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Staffer
House of Commons, Office of Sarkis Assadourian, Member of Parliament |
1993 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Staffer
House of Commons, Office of Hon. Robert Kaplan, Member of Parliament |
1992 to 1993 | Not a designated office |