CN operates Canada's largest railway system, supplying customers in Canada, the U.S. and abroad with freight rail transportation and related services.
E. Hunter Harrison, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2007-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Transport Canada (TC) | $4,182,204.00 | Yes |
Transport Canada (TC) | $811,145.21 | Yes |
Address:
935 de La Gauchetiere St. West
Montréal, QC H3B 2M9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-562-9580
Fax number:
613-562-9324
The Canadian National Railway Company / La Compagnie des chemins de fer nationaux du Canada is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The Canadian National Railway Company/La Compagnie des chemins de fer nationaux du Canada | 2024-03-01 | current |
The Canadian National Railway Company/La Compagnie des chemins de fer nationaux du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2024-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Tracy Robinson | 2022-02-28 | Current |
Jean-Jacques Ruest | 2018-03-05 | 2022-02-28 |
Luc Jobin | 2016-07-01 | 2018-03-05 |
Claude Mongeau | 2010-01-01 | 2016-07-01 |
E. Hunter Harrison | 2005-08-15 | 2010-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Transport Canada, Deputy Minister's Office |
1972 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Transport Canada, Deputy Minister's Office |
1972 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Rulings Officer
Revenue Canada, Taxation |
1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Operations and Senior Advisor
Prime Minister's Office, no branch |
March 2001 to January 2004 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to the Minister
Transport Canada, Minister's Office |
November 1982 to June 1984 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to the Minister of Transport
Transport Canada, Minister's Office |
1982 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to the Minister
Department of Justice, Minister's Office |
September 1979 to July 1980 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to the Minister of Transport
Transport Canada, Minister's Office |
1978 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General of Strategic Policy
Transport Canada, Policy Group |
2002 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Vice-Chair
Canada Transportation Act Review Panel, no branch |
2000 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Vice-Chair
Canada Transportation Agency, Chairman's Office |
1996 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Student
House of Commons, Standing Committee on Regulations and Other Statutory Instruments |
May 1976 to October 1976 | Not a designated office |
Counsel
Canadian Transport Commission, Legal Services |
1976 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legal Counsel
Transport Canada, Legal Services |
September 2002 to July 2006 | Not a designated office |
Legal Counsel
Canadian Transportation Agency, Legal Services |
September 2000 to September 2002 | Not a designated office |
Counsel
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Trade Law Division (JLT) |
May 1999 to September 2000 | Not a designated office |
Legal Counsel
Canadian Transportation Agency, Legal Services |
June 1998 to May 1999 | Not a designated office |