CMA represents the marketing industry on key issues; takes a leadership role on issues that impact the industry; establishes and promotes standards of practice; promotes integrity and high standards of business conduct among its members; is a major source of education and skills development and provides opportunities for members to meet, network, exchange information and do business together.
JOHN GUSTAVSON, PRESIDENT & C.E.O.
Address:
1 Concorde Gate
Suite 607
Don Mills, ON M3C 3N6
Canada
Telephone number:
416-391-2362
Fax number:
416-441-4062
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CANADIAN MARKETING ASSOCIATION/ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DU MARKETING | 2024-05-14 | current |
CANADIAN MARKETING ASSOCIATION/ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DU MARKETING | 2008-08-13 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Alison Simpson | 2023-01-01 | Current |
Sartaj Sarkaria | 2022-06-02 | 2023-01-01 |
John Wiltshire | 2017-06-26 | 2022-06-02 |
Doug Brooks | 2015-07-06 | 2017-06-26 |
JOHN GUSTAVSON | 1996-03-29 | 2015-07-06 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Government House Leader, Government House Leader |
February 1990 to April 1992 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Industry, Science & Technology, Minister of Industry, Science & Technology |
October 1988 to February 1990 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Consumer & Corporate Affairs, Minister of Consumer & Corporate Affairs |
July 1986 to October 1988 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant - Policy
National Defence, Associate Minister of National Defence |
August 1985 to July 1986 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant - Policy
Supply & Services, Minister of Supply & Services |
September 1984 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |