Nombre total de rapports de communication : 107
Rapports mensuels de communications au cours des 6 derniers mois : 0
The University of Winnipeg received its charter in 1967 but its roots date back more than 130 years. The founding colleges were Manitoba College (1871) and Wesley College (1888), which merged to form United College in 1938. Located in the heart of downtown, The University of Winnipeg is a compact, diverse, multicultural academic community committed to access and excellence. Ranked by our graduates in Maclean's magazine University Graduate Survey (June 19, 2006) in the Top Ten of all Canadian universities when asked about their "Entire Educational Experience". UWinnipeg is home to more than 9200 full and part-time students.
Lloyd Axworthy, President
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2010-03-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Canada Research Chairs (CRC) | 750 000,00 $ | Oui |
CFI | 386 422,00 $ | Oui |
Conseil de recherches en sciences humaines (CRSH) | 729 234,00 $ | Oui |
Conseil de recherches en sciences naturelles et en génie (CRSNG) | 1 129 794,00 $ | Oui |
Council on Post-Secondary Education (COPSE) (Operating Grant) | 49 889 388,00 $ | Oui |
Indirect Cost of Research Grant | 850 273,00 $ | Oui |
Other Federal Agencies (<$100,000) | 298 684,00 $ | Oui |
Other Provincial Agencies (<$100,000) | 498 538,00 $ | Oui |
Province of Manitoba - Science Building Capital Grants | 14 946 382,00 $ | Oui |
Province of MB - Capital Grants | 3 046 104,00 $ | Oui |
Province of MB - Department of Education | 1 878 846,00 $ | Oui |
Province of MB - MB Scholarship & Bursary Initiative | 815 000,00 $ | Oui |
Province of MB - MRIF | 137 160,00 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
515 Portage Avenue
Winnipeg, MB R3B 2E9
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
204-786-9214
Numéro de fax :
204-786-1693
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
The University of Winnipeg | 2024-03-31 | actuel |
The University of Winnipeg | 2008-07-11 | 2024-03-31 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Todd Mondor | 2022-04-01 | Actuel |
James Currie | 2020-08-01 | 2022-04-01 |
Annette Trimbee | 2014-08-01 | 2020-08-01 |
Neil Besner | 2014-07-01 | 2014-08-01 |
Lloyd Axworthy | 2005-08-25 | 2014-07-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Minister of Foreign Affairs
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Not Applicable |
janvier 1996 à octobre 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of Western Economic Diversification
Western Economic Diversification, Not Applicable |
novembre 1993 à janvier 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of Labour
Department of Labour, Not Applicable |
novembre 1993 à février 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of Employment and Immigration
Department of Employment and Immigration, Not Applicable |
novembre 1993 à janvier 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of State
Canadian Wheat Board, Not Applicable |
juin 1984 à septembre 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of Transport
Transport Canada, Not Applicable |
août 1983 à septembre 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister Responsible for the Status of Women
Department of Canadian Heritage, Not Applicable |
mars 1980 à septembre 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of Employment and Immigration
Department of Employment and Immigration, Not Applicable |
mars 1980 à août 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Regional Executive Director
Department of Canadian Heritage, Prairie & Northwest Territories Region |
novembre 1993 à octobre 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director General, Communications & Culture
Department of Communications, Prairie & Northwest Territories Region |
août 1990 à novembre 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Operations, Staffing Programs
Public Service Commission, Manitoba/Saskatchewan Region |
juin 1988 à août 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant Regional Director
Department of Secretary of State, Manitoba Regional Office |
mars 1982 à juin 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Social Development Officer, Multiculturalism Programs
Department of Secretary of State, Manitoba Regional Office |
février 1978 à mars 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Environment Canada, Office of the Minister of the Environment |
juillet 2004 à mars 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
Western Economic Diversification, Office of the Minister of Western Economic Diversification |
janvier 2004 à juillet 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Advisor
Queen's Privy Council and Intergovernmental Affairs, Not Applicable |
mars 2001 à janvier 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Staff Officer Communications
Department of National Defence, Directorate of Cadets |
juillet 2000 à mars 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |