Subject matters | Details | Categories |
---|---|---|
Agriculture, Consumer Issues
|
Agricultural Support Programs in respect to lending programs
|
Policies or Program
|
Financial Institutions
|
Bank Act in respect to the five year financial system review.
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution
|
Employment and Training
|
Canada Labour Code in respect to employment standards
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution
|
Financial Institutions
|
Canadian Payments Association Act in respect to the five year financial system review
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution
|
Climate, Financial Institutions
|
Climate Change Strategy in respect to government's plans for a strategy on climate change
|
Policies or Program
|
Financial Institutions, National Security/Security
|
Cyber Security Policy as it applies to financial institutions
|
Policies or Program
|
Financial Institutions, Privacy and Access to Information
|
Data Transfer Policy as it applies to financial institutions
|
Regulation, Policies or Program
|
Financial Institutions, Labour
|
Diversity and Inclusion Policy as it applies to financial institutions
|
Policies or Program, Regulation
|
Financial Institutions
|
Financial Services Policy in respect to adhering to banking.
|
Policies or Program
|
Housing
|
Housing Policy as it applies to financial institutions
|
Policies or Program
|
Taxation and Finance
|
Income Tax Act as it applies to corporate taxation, investment and international taxation.
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution
|
Privacy and Access to Information
|
Personal Information Protection and Electronic Documents Act (PIPEDA) Review in respect to providing input on privacy regulations
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution
|
Privacy and Access to Information
|
Privacy Act as it applies to the protection of customer and bank information
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution
|
The Toronto-Dominion Bank and its subsidiaries are collectively known as TD Bank Financial Group. TD Bank Financial Group serves customers in four key businesses operating in a number of locations in key financial centres around the globe: Canadian Personal and Commercial Banking including TD Canada Trust; Wealth management including the global operations of TD Waterhouse; Wholesale Banking, including TD Securities; and U.S. Personal and Commercial Banking through TD Banknorth and TD Commerce.
Bharat Masrani, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
c/o 66 Wellington St. West
15th Floor, TD Tower
Toronto, ON M5K 1A2
Canada
Telephone number:
800-430-6095
Fax number:
416-982-5051
The Toronto-Dominion Bank is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The Toronto-Dominion Bank | 2024-05-01 | current |
The Toronto-Dominion Bank | 2008-07-02 | 2024-05-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bharat Masrani | 2014-11-01 | Current |
W. Edmund Clark | 2005-08-19 | 2014-11-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Crew Supervisor
Department of Natural Resources, N/A |
May 1984 to August 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Project Leader, Intergovernmental Issues
Department of Finance, Financial Services Division |
2000 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Finance Canada, Minister's Office |
December 2003 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Minister's Office |
May 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Leader of the Government in the House of Commons, Minister's Office |
January 2002 to May 2002 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's Office |
May 2001 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Canadian Wheat Board, Minister's Office |
May 1999 to May 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Director
Office of the Superintendent of Financial Institutions, Conglomerate Banks and Insurance |
March 2002 to March 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Economist
Privy Council Office, Liaison Secretariat for Macroeconomic Policy, Intergovernmental Relations, Ops |
October 2006 to December 2012 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Natural Resources Canada, Policy and Economics Branch |
June 2005 to October 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Crew Supervisor
Department of Natural Resources, N/A |
May 1984 to August 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Standards Council of Canada, Office of the Chief Executive Officer |
October 1992 to November 1998 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Forestry, Minister's Office |
March 1991 to October 1992 | Not a designated office |