Genome Canada is the primary funding and information resource relating to genomics and proteomics in Canada. Dedicated to developing and implementing a national strategy in genomics and proteomics research for the benefit of all Canadians, it has so far received $840 million from the Government of Canada. Genome Canada has established six Genome Centres across the country (Atlantic, Quebec, Ontario, Prairies, Alberta and British Columbia) and has as a main objective to ensure that Canada becomes a world leader in genomics and proteomics research. Together with its six genome centres and with other partners, Genome Canada invests in and manages large-scale research projects in key selected areas such as agriculture, environment, fisheries, forestry, health and new technology development. Genome Canada also supports research projects aimed at studying and analyzing the ethical, environmental, economic, legal and social issues related to genomics research (GE3LS).
Marc Desmarais, Vice-président, Relations gouvernementales
End date of the last completed financial year: 2008-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Gouvernement du Canada (dernier budget) | $100,000,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
150 Metcalfe Street, Suite 2100
Ottawa, ON K2P 1P1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-751-4460
Ext.
115
Fax number:
613-751-4474
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Genome Canada | 2024-03-07 | current |
Genome Canada | 2008-07-02 | 2024-03-07 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Robert Annan | 2020-01-01 | Current |
MARC LEPAGE | 2016-01-04 | 2020-01-01 |
Cindy Bell | 2015-07-20 | 2016-01-04 |
Pierre Meulien | 2010-10-18 | 2015-07-20 |
Dale Patterson | 2009-10-01 | 2010-10-18 |
Cindy Bell | 2009-03-31 | 2009-10-01 |
Marc Desmarais | 2005-09-22 | 2009-03-31 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Directrice adjointe
Santé Canada, Instituts de recherche en santé du Canada |
1994 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Adjoint exécutif
Gouvernement du Canada, ACDI et MAECI |
October 1997 to May 1999 | Not a designated office |
Adjoint à la recherche et aux communications
Le Sénat du Canada, Bureau du chef de l'opposition |
December 1985 to November 1987 | Not a designated office |
Adjoint
Chambre des communes, Alain Tardif, député - Lucie Pépin, député - Alfonso Gagliano, député |
October 1985 to December 1985 | Not a designated office |
Adjoint exécutif et adjoint aux communications
Chambre des communes, Alain Tardif, député - Jean-Claude Malépart, député |
April 1984 to December 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Directrice adjointe
Santé Canada, Instituts de recherche en santé du Canada |
1994 to 2000 | Not a designated office |