World Vision Canada (WVC) is a Christian relief, development and advocacy organization dedicated to working with children, families and communities to overcome poverty and injustice. WVC is dedicated to working with the world’s most vulnerable people and it serves all people regardless of religion, race, ethnicity or gender.
DAVE TOYCEN, Chief Executive Officer (CEO) AND PRESIDENT
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-09-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Foreign Affairs, Trade and Development Canada | $12,441,268.00 | Yes |
Address:
1 WORLD DRIVE
MISSISSAUGA, ON L5T 2Y4
Canada
Telephone number:
905-565-6200
Fax number:
905-696-2161
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
WORLD VISION CANADA | 2024-05-07 | current |
WORLD VISION CANADA | 2008-08-14 | 2024-05-07 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Messenger | 2015-06-04 | Current |
DAVE TOYCEN | 1996-11-06 | 2015-06-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Junior Project Analyst
CIDA, Bilateral Program |
January 2011 to September 2011 | Not a designated office |
Student Intern
Service Canada, Integrity Branch |
May 2010 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |
Electrician's Assistant
RCMP, RCMP training depot- Regina |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Office of Keith Martin, M.P. |
September 2007 to November 2009 | Not a designated office |