TransCanada operates a network of natural gas pipelines that extends more than 67,000 kilometres (42,000 miles), tapping into virtually all major gas supply basins in North America. TransCanada is one of the continent's largest providers of gas storage and related services with more than 368 billion cubic feet of storage capacity. A growing independent power producer, TransCanada owns or has interests in over 13,100 megawatts of power generation in Canada and the United States. TransCanada is developing one of North America's largest liquids delivery systems.
Russell Girling, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2015-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Government of Canada (Canada-Alberta Job Grant) | $999.91 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $1,506,198.00 | Yes |
Address:
450 - 1st Street, SW
Calgary, AB T2P 5H1
Canada
Telephone number:
403-920-2000
Fax number:
403-920-2467
TransCanada Corporation is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
TransCanada PipeLines Limited/ | 2024-05-09 | current |
TransCanada PipeLines Limited/ | 2023-05-03 | 2024-05-09 |
TC Energy Corporation/Corporation TC Énergie | 2019-05-03 | 2023-05-03 |
TransCanada Corporation | 2008-07-02 | 2019-05-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Francois Poirier | 2021-01-01 | Current |
Russell Girling | 2010-07-01 | 2021-01-01 |
Harold Kvisle | 2005-10-24 | 2010-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Program Auditor (Co-operative Summer Student Position)
Consumer & Corporate Affairs, - |
May 1976 to August 1976 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief (Manager)/Acting Director
National Energy Board, Financial Regulation Division |
1995 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Economist/Senior Economist
National Energy Board, Economics Division |
1992 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Energy, Mines and Resources, Fiscal Policy Branch |
1991 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Student Project Engineer
Parks Canada, Rideau Canal Operations |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |