We are a vital part of everyday life — delivering the energy millions of people rely on to power their lives in a sustainable way. Thanks to a safe, reliable network of natural gas and crude oil pipelines, along with power generation and storage facilities, wherever life happens — we’re there. Guided by our core values of safety, responsibility, collaboration and integrity, our 7,500 people make a positive difference in the communities where we operate across Canada, the U.S. and Mexico.
Francois Poirier, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2020-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Alberta Environment and Parks | $0.00 | Yes |
Emmissions Reduction Alberta (ERA) | $2,407,500.00 | Yes |
Ministry of Labour and Immigration – Canada-Alberta Job Grants Training | $8,525.77 | No |
Address:
450 - 1st Street, SW
Calgary, AB T2P 5H1
Canada
Telephone number:
403-920-2000
Fax number:
403-920-2467
TC Energy Corporation / Corporation TC Énergie is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
TransCanada PipeLines Limited/ | 2024-05-09 | current |
TransCanada PipeLines Limited/ | 2023-05-03 | 2024-05-09 |
TC Energy Corporation/Corporation TC Énergie | 2019-05-03 | 2023-05-03 |
TransCanada Corporation | 2008-07-02 | 2019-05-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Francois Poirier | 2021-01-01 | Current |
Russell Girling | 2010-07-01 | 2021-01-01 |
Harold Kvisle | 2005-10-24 | 2010-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief of Staff
Office of the Prime Minister, Office of the Prime Minister |
January 2006 to May 2009 | May 1, 2009 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Contractor
Natural Resources Canada, Ottawa |
March 2009 to December 2009 | Not a designated office |
Contractor
Department of Finance, Ottawa |
December 2008 to February 2009 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student/Tour Guide
Canadian Museum of Civilization, Ottawa |
May 1987 to April 1988 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student/Tour Guide
Senate of Canada, Ottawa |
May 1984 to December 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister |
August 2004 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
December 2003 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Transport Canada, Office of the Secretary of State (Crown Corporations) |
April 2003 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Western Economic Diversification, Office of the Secretary of State |
April 2001 to April 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief of Staff
Office of the Prime Minister, Office of the Prime Minister |
January 2006 to May 2009 | May 1, 2009 |