THE CANADIAN FERTILIZER INSITUTE (CFI) REPRESENTS FERTILIZER MANUFACTURERS AND WHOLESALE AND RETAIL DISTRIBUTORS. CFI AIMS TO SUPPORT THE INDUSTRY'S CONTRIBUTION TO THE SUPPLY OF SAFE AND NUTRITIOUS FOOD. WE PROMOTE THE SUSTAINABLE AND SAFE PRODUCTION, DISTRIBUTION AND USE OF FERTILIZERS. CFI HAS 39 ACTIVE MEMBERS AND 25 ASSOCIATE AND AFFILIATE MEMBERS. THE ASSOCIATION SUPPORTS RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND CERTIFICATION PROGRAMS THAT ARE FOCUSED ON EFFICIENT USE OF FERTILIZERS. CFI BELIEVES THAT BY FOCUSING ON THE RESPONSIBLE PRODUCTION AND USE OF FERTILIZER, AND NOURISHING THE SOIL, THE FERTILIZER INDUSTRY WILL MAKE A VALUABLE CONTRIBUTION TO THE SUSTAINABILITY OF WORLD FOOD PRODUCTION.
CLYDE GRAHAM, ACTING PRESIDENT
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-06-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $144,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
350 Sparks Street
Suite 907
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-230-2600
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Fertilizer Canada/Fertilisants Canada | 2024-04-18 | current |
Fertilizer Canada/Fertilisants Canada | 2015-08-24 | 2024-04-18 |
Canadian Fertilizer Institute/Institut canadien des engrais | 2008-12-12 | 2015-08-24 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Karen Proud | 2021-04-01 | Current |
Garth Whyte | 2015-06-15 | 2021-04-01 |
CLYDE GRAHAM | 2014-10-01 | 2015-06-15 |
ROGER LARSON | 1996-09-19 | 2014-10-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Office of the Leader of the Government, Office of the Leader of the Government |
July 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Office of the Minister of Transport, Office of the Minister of Transport |
December 2003 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, Office of the Deputy Prime Minister |
November 1997 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant/Press Secretary
Office of the Leader of the Government, Privy Council |
November 1993 to November 1997 | Not a designated office |