CAE is a leading provider of simulation and modelling technologies and integrated training services for civil aviation, and defence customers worldwide.Founded in 1947 and headquartered in Canada, CAE has manufacturing operations and training facilities in more than 20 countries on five continents. Ninety per cent of CAE's C$1.6 billion annual revenues are derived from worldwide exports. CAE's shares are traded on the Toronto and New York stock exchanges (TSX: CAE; NYSE: CAE) Simulation Products:CAE has simulated almost every modern airliner for both major and regional carriers, as well as many of today's business jets. CAE has long been the world's leading supplier of full-flight simulators, with more than 700 simulators sold to more than 110 airlines, aircraft manufacturers and training centres. CAE also has a wealth of experience in developing prototype simulators for new types of aircraft. Civil Training and Services:CAE is now a world leader in aviation training services, serving all segments of the market including aircraft manufacturers, flight schools, business aircraft and helicopter operators, as well as regional and major airlines. CAE currently has more than 140 full-flight simulators installed in more than 20 training centres worldwide.Military Simulation and Training:CAE is also a global leader in the design of sophisticated military training systems for air, land and sea applications, having supplied the defence forces of more than 30 nations with military training systems and services. In addition to its comprehensive training services, the company offers a range of simulation equipment and modelling and simulation software.
Marc Parent, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2010-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Strategic Aerospace and Defence Initiative | $48,977,761.00 | Yes |
Technology Partnership Canada | $3,905,137.00 | Yes |
Address:
8585 Côte-de-Liesse Rd.
Saint-Laurent, QC H4T 1G6
Canada
Telephone number:
514-734-5730
Fax number:
514-340-5519
cae inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
cae inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
cae inc. | 2024-05-31 | current |
cae inc. | 2008-08-12 | 2024-05-31 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Marc Parent | 2009-10-01 | Current |
ROBERT BROWN | 2005-09-16 | 2009-10-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager of Aircraft Structures
Canadian Forces, Airworthiness Branch |
1989 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer - Quality Engineering Test Establishment
Canadian Forces, Hull, Que |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Post-Graduate Training
Canadian Forces, Toronto |
1984 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Project Engineering Officer
Canadian Forces, Aircraft Maintenance Development (Trenton |
1982 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Maintenance Officer
Canadian Forces, Canadian Force Base - Greenwood, N.S. |
1980 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Aerospace Engineering Officer
Canadian Forces, Canadian Air Force |
1980 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Sr. Aerospace Engineering Officer
Canadian Forces, Bagotville |
1994 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Major
Canadian Forces, Commanding Office |
1993 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Lieutenant
Canadian Forces, CF 18 Weapon System Software Unit |
1989 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Master of Engineering Degree
Canadian Forces, RMC and Queens University |
1987 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Lieutenant - Line Service Officer
Canadian Forces, Baden Soellingen, West Germany |
1985 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Canadian Forces Officer Course
Canadian Forces, CFB Chilliwalk |
1982 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Electrical Engineering Training Program
Canadian Forces, Royal Roads University |
1980 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Master Caporal
Canadian Forces, Junior Leadership Course |
1980 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Instructor
Canadian Forces, CFB Borden |
1978 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Maintenance Technician
Canadian Forces, Uplands - Ottawa |
1974 to 1978 | Not a designated office |
Communications and Radar Systems Technician
Canadian Forces, Canadian Forces Aerospace & Engineering - Borden |
1974 to 1974 | Not a designated office |
Recruit Training
Canadian Forces, Canadian Armed Forces |
1973 to 1973 | Not a designated office |