CAE (NYSE: CAE; TSX: CAE) is a global leader in providing comprehensive training solutions based on world-leading simulation technology and integrated training services. The company employs 8,000 people at more than 160 sites and training locations in 35 countries. Our vision is to be our customers' Partner of Choice and we take a long-term approach to customer relationships. We offer our civil aviation and defence and security customers a complete range of highly innovative product, service and training centre solutions designed to help them meet their mission critical needs for safety, efficiency and readiness. We provide similar solutions to customers in healthcare and mining. CAE has the largest installed base of civil and military flight simulators, supported by a range of after-sales services, and has been serving the needs of its customers for nearly 70 years. We have the broadest training services network in the world and offer civil aviation, military and helicopter training services in 67 locations worldwide and train more than 120,000 civil and military crewmembers annually. www.cae.com
Marc Parent, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2014-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Strategic Aerospace and Defence Initiative | $49,600,820.00 | Yes |
Address:
8585 Côte-de-Liesse Rd.
Saint-Laurent, QC H4T 1G6
Canada
Telephone number:
514-734-5730
Fax number:
514-340-5519
cae inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
cae inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
cae inc. | 2024-05-31 | current |
cae inc. | 2008-08-12 | 2024-05-31 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Marc Parent | 2009-10-01 | Current |
ROBERT BROWN | 2005-09-16 | 2009-10-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager of Aircraft Structures
Canadian Forces, Airworthiness Branch |
1989 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer - Quality Engineering Test Establishment
Canadian Forces, Hull, Que |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Post-Graduate Training
Canadian Forces, Toronto |
1984 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Project Engineering Officer
Canadian Forces, Aircraft Maintenance Development (Trenton |
1982 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Maintenance Officer
Canadian Forces, Canadian Force Base - Greenwood, N.S. |
1980 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Aerospace Engineering Officer
Canadian Forces, Canadian Air Force |
1980 to 1980 | Not a designated office |