CROPLIFE CANADA (FORMERLY THE CROP PROTECTION INSTITUTE OF CANADA) IS THE TRADE ASSOCIATION REPRESENTING THE DEVELOPERS, MANUFACTURERS AND DISTRIBUTORS OF PLANT SCIENCE INNOVATIONS - PEST CONTROL PRODUCTS AND PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY - FOR USE IN AGRICULTURE, URBAN AND PUBLIC HEALTH SETTINGS. CROPLIFE CANADA STANDS FOR SAFETY AND INNOVATION IN ALL PRODUCTS SUPPORTED BY A FOUNDATION OF CONTINUOUS RESEARCH AND A STRONG COMMITMENT TO STEWARDSHIP.
Pierre Petelle, President & CEO
Address:
350 Sparks Street, Suite 1201
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-230-9881
Ext.
3222
Fax number:
613-233-4913
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CROPLIFE CANADA | 2024-05-14 | current |
CROPLIFE CANADA | 2009-12-07 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Pierre Petelle | 2016-12-28 | Current |
Ted Menzies | 2014-03-01 | 2016-12-28 |
LORNE HEPWORTH | 1997-12-24 | 2014-03-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Assignemnt: Director of Innovation and Ingenuity
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Public Affairs Branch |
March 2016 to February 2017 | Not a designated office |
Director Asia and Oceania Division
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Market Access Secretariat |
January 2012 to February 2016 | Not a designated office |
Director Americas Division
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Markey Access Secretariat |
December 2009 to December 2012 | Not a designated office |
Acting Chief, Strategic Intergration and Competitiveness Policy Division
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
April 2009 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Director Market Access Secretariat
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Bilateral Relations and Technical Trade Policy |
April 2009 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Director, Latin America and the Carribean
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, International Trade Policy Directorate |
July 2006 to April 2009 | Not a designated office |
Trade Policy Analyst, United States
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, International Trade Policy Directorate |
February 2002 to July 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Governance & Outreach
CFIA, Governance & Outreach |
July 2012 to September 2014 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Cabinet Affairs
CFIA, Cabinet Affairs |
February 2010 to July 2012 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor to Executive Director, Plant Health
CFIA, Plant Health |
2009 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Seed Policy
CFIA, Seed Policy |
2006 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Plant Biosafety Officer
CFIA, Plant Health |
2004 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Assignemnt: Director of Innovation and Ingenuity
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Public Affairs Branch |
March 2016 to February 2017 | Not a designated office |
Director Asia and Oceania Division
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Market Access Secretariat |
January 2012 to February 2016 | Not a designated office |
Director Americas Division
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Markey Access Secretariat |
December 2009 to December 2012 | Not a designated office |
Acting Chief, Strategic Intergration and Competitiveness Policy Division
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
April 2009 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Director Market Access Secretariat
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, Bilateral Relations and Technical Trade Policy |
April 2009 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Director, Latin America and the Carribean
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, International Trade Policy Directorate |
July 2006 to April 2009 | Not a designated office |
Trade Policy Analyst, United States
Agriculture and Agri Food Canada, International Trade Policy Directorate |
February 2002 to July 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Office of the Prime Minister, Prime Minister |
April 1990 to July 1993 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
Stan Wilbee, Member of Parliament |
January 1989 to January 1990 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Bob Brisco, Member of Parliament |
July 1988 to November 1988 | Not a designated office |