The Association both coordinates joint projects of its member libraries and engages in advocacy on a number of issues on behalf of its university library members. Examples of joint projects, past or present, would include creation of a consortial licensing body for digital scholarly materials, creation of an coordinating organization for the digitization of heritage materials, creation of a system of open access digital repositories, development of a collaborative infrastructure for the archiving and sharing of research data, coordination of statistical reporting from member libraries, coordination of a library service evaluation process among members, organization of study tours for member library director groups, organization of general meetings of members, etc. In terms of advocacy, the Association has interests in such public policy themes as copyright, broadband access, open access to publicly-funded research results and data, government support for research data management, government support for the digitization of heritage documents, direct and indirect federal research funding, and lawful access.
Brent Roe, EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR
Adresse :
Suite 600
350 Albert Street
OTTAWA, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-482-9344
Poste
101
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Canadian Association of Research Libraries/Association des bibliothèques de recherche du Canada | 2024-06-10 | actuel |
Canadian Association of Research Libraries/Association des bibliothèques de recherche du Canada | 2009-06-03 | 2024-06-10 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Susan Haigh | 2014-10-22 | Actuel |
Katherine McColgan | 2014-06-26 | 2014-10-22 |
Brent Roe | 2009-06-03 | 2014-06-26 |
TIMOTHY MARK | 1997-03-24 | 2005-02-10 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
Parliament of Canada (House of Commons), Office of Fin Donnelly, MP |
février 2010 à décembre 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Assistant
Parliament of Canada (House of Commons), Office of Chris Charlton, MP |
mai 2009 à février 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Members Assistant
Parliament of Canada (House of Commons), Office of Dawn Black, MP |
août 2008 à avril 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
Parliament of Canada (House of Commons), Office of Fin Donnelly, MP |
février 2010 à décembre 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Assistant
Parliament of Canada (House of Commons), Office of Chris Charlton, MP |
mai 2009 à février 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Members Assistant
Parliament of Canada (House of Commons), Office of Dawn Black, MP |
août 2008 à avril 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |