THE REAL PROPERTY ASSOCIATION OF CANADA IS AN IMPORTANT VOICE FOR THE CANADIAN REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT INDUSTRY. IT SERVES AS A FORUM FOR THE DISCUSSION OF PRINCIPAL ISSUES AFFECTING THIS MAJOR INDUSTRY AND AS A VEHICLE FOR THE PRESENTATION OF ITS VIEWS TO THE PUBLIC AND TO GOVERNMENTS. ITS MEMBER FIRMS INCLUDE MOST OF CANADA'S LARGE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT COMPANIES AND REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT TRUSTS (REITS) WHOSE SHARES ARE PUBLICLY TRADED ON RECOGNIZED SECURITIES MARKETS, PLUS REAL ESTATE SUBSIDIARIES OF PUBLIC COMPANIES, LARGE PRIVATELY OWNED REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT COMPANIES, TRUST COMPANIES, LIFE INSURANCE ENTERPRISES, PENSION FUNDS & BANKS.
S. MICHAEL BROOKS, EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR
Address:
ONE UNIVERSITY AVENUE, SUITE 1410
TORONTO, ON M5J 2P1
Canada
Telephone number:
416-642-2700
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
REAL PROPERTY ASSOCIATION OF CANADA (REALPAC) | 2023-10-23 | current |
REAL PROPERTY ASSOCIATION OF CANADA (REALPAC) | 2008-08-07 | 2023-10-23 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
S. MICHAEL BROOKS | 2014-01-16 | Current |
Paul Morse | 2012-03-05 | 2013-10-02 |
S. MICHAEL BROOKS | 2005-03-15 | 2012-03-05 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Orders-in-Council
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister of Canada, PCO |
September 2000 to February 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Office of the Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister, Human Resources Development |
October 1999 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister, Veterans Affairs and the Atlantic Canada Opportunties Agency (ACOA) |
July 1997 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Member of Parliament for Labrador, Parliament of Canada |
January 1997 to April 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Member of Parliament for Humber-St Barbe-Baie Verte, Parliament of Canada |
September 1996 to January 1997 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Office of the Minister, Fisheries and Oceans |
May 1995 to September 1995 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Office of the Minister, Fisheries and Oceans |
May 1994 to September 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Orders-in-Council
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister of Canada, PCO |
September 2000 to February 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Office of the Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister, Human Resources Development |
October 1999 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister, Veterans Affairs and the Atlantic Canada Opportunties Agency (ACOA) |
July 1997 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Member of Parliament for Labrador, Parliament of Canada |
January 1997 to April 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Member of Parliament for Humber-St Barbe-Baie Verte, Parliament of Canada |
September 1996 to January 1997 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Office of the Minister, Fisheries and Oceans |
May 1995 to September 1995 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Office of the Minister, Fisheries and Oceans |
May 1994 to September 1994 | Not a designated office |