Version 10 de 15 (2001-06-08 à 2002-01-22) a été soumis avant l'entrée en vigueur de la Loi sur le lobbying, le 2 juillet 2008. En raison d'exigences de renseignements différents à ce moment-là, l'enregistrement est présenté sous le format suivant.
Organisation : |
TORONTO BOARD OF TRADE (THE)
P.O. BOX 60, 1 FIRST CANADIAN PLACE TORONTO, ON M5X 1C1 Canada |
Numéro de téléphone : | 416-366-6811 |
Numéro de fax : | 416-366-6460 |
Nom et poste de l'agent responsable pendant la période de cet enregistrement : | ELYSE ALLAN, PRESIDENT & CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER |
Description des activités de l'organisation : | THE TORONTO BOARD OF TRADE IS THE LARGEST COMMUNITY BOARD OF TRADE OR CHAMBER OF COMMERCE IN THE COUNTRY. WE ARE AN INDEPENDENT, NON-PROFIT ORGANIZATION.THE BOARD'S OBJECTIVES ARE: TO SERVE AS A VOICE OF THE BUSINESS COMMUNITY OF METRO TORONTO; TO PROVIDE A FORUM FOR THE BUSINESS COMMUNITY TO DEVELOP OPINIONS & PROGRAMS WHICH CONTRIBUTE TO THE SOCIAL, ECONOMIC & PHYSICAL QUALITY OF LIFE; TO PROVIDE A SOCIETY & ECONOMY BASED ON PRIVATE ENTERPRISE & CONCERN FOR THE INDIVIDUAL TO COMMUNICATE INFORMATION ON TOPICAL SUBJECTS OF INTEREST TO MEMBERS; TO FACILITATE BUSINESS AND SOCIAL CONTACT AMONG ITS MEMBERS. THE TORONTO BOARD OF TRADE'S MISSION IS TO BUILD A BETTER COMMUNITY THROUGH BUSINESS LEADERSHIP. OUR VOLUNTEERS AND STAFF ACHIEVE THIS BY PROVIDING BUSINESS SERVICES, ADVOCATING PUBLIC POLICY POSITIONS, PARTICIPATING IN COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIPS, AND FACILITATING ECONOMIC AND BUSINESS DEVELOPMENT. |
Membres ou types de membres de l'organisation. : | MEMBERSHIP CONSISTS OF INDIVIDUALS, FIRMS, PARTNERSHIPS, CORPORATIONS OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY ENGAGED IN TRADE, COMMERCE OR THE PROFESSIONS, WHO SUBSCRIBE TO THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CORPORATION AND ARE INTERESTED IN THE PROGRESS AND WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY. THERE ARE FIVE CLASSES OF MEMBERSHIP: INDIVIDUAL (RESIDENT, NON-RESIDENT AND RETIRED); CORPORATE; JUNIOR; HONORARY AND COURTESY. |
L'organisation a-t-elle été financée en tout ou en partie par une institution gouvernementale domestique ou étrangère au cours du dernier exercice financier complet? | Non |
Nom : | ELYSE ALLAN |
Titre du poste : | PRESIDENT & CHIEF OPERATING OFFICER |
Charges publiques occupées : | S/O. La divulgation de cette information n'était pas une exigence avant le 20 juin 2005. |
Nom : | PAUL LARUCCIA |
Titre du poste : | POLICY ADVISOR |
Charges publiques occupées : | S/O. La divulgation de cette information n'était pas une exigence avant le 20 juin 2005. |
Nom : | TERRI LOHNES |
Titre du poste : | POLICY ADVISOR - ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
Charges publiques occupées : | S/O. La divulgation de cette information n'était pas une exigence avant le 20 juin 2005. |
Nom : | NORM TULSIANI |
Titre du poste : | LEGAL COUNSEL, POLICY ADVISOR |
Charges publiques occupées : | S/O. La divulgation de cette information n'était pas une exigence avant le 20 juin 2005. |
Nom : | LOUISE VERITY |
Titre du poste : | DIRECTOR OF POLICY |
Charges publiques occupées : | S/O. La divulgation de cette information n'était pas une exigence avant le 20 juin 2005. |
Institutions fédérales qui ont été ou seront consultées au cours de l'engagement. : | Affaires étrangères et Commerce international Canada (MAECIC), Citoyenneté et Immigration Canada, Commission canadienne des pensions (CCP), Commission d'appel des pensions (CAP), Commission de l'immigration et du statut de réfugié du Canada (CISR), Conseil canadien des relations du travail (CCRT), Défense nationale (MDN), Développement des ressources humaines Canada (DRHC), Finances Canada (FIN), Industrie Canada, Office national de l'énergie (ONÉ), Patrimoine canadien (PCH), Revenu Canada (RC), Santé Canada (SC), Transports Canada (TC) |
Techniques de communication déjà utilisées ou qui seront utilisées au cours de l'engagement :
|
Appels téléphoniques, Communications informelles, Communications écrites, en format papier ou électronique, Présentations, Réunions |
Objet : Sujets de préoccupation : | Arts et culture, Commerce intérieur, Commerce international, Défense, Développement régional, Éducation, Emploi et formation, Énergie, Environnement, Immigration, Impôts et finances, Industrie, Infrastructure, Institutions financières, Justice et application des lois, Marchés publics, Petites entreprises, Propriété intellectuelle, Questions constitutionnelles, Questions touchant les consommateurs, Santé, Sciences et technologies, Télécommunications, Tourisme, Transports, Travail |
Objets poursuivis : Renseignements rétrospectifs : | NOVEMBER 2000 - LETTER TO PRIME MINISTER, CO-ADDRESSED TO PREMIER OF ONTARIO, AND MAYOR OF THE CITY OF TORONTO RE: PRIVATE SECTOR LEADERSHIP IN THE DESIGN OF THE TORONTO WATERFRONT DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION - DECEMBER 2000 - LETTER TO DANIEL HAYES, DEPUTY LEADER OF SENATE REGARDING CANADIAN BUSINESS CORPORATIONS ACT REFORMFEBRUARY 2001 - LETTER TO BRIAN TOBIN, MINISTER OF INDUSTRY RE: CANADA CORPORATIONS ACT REFORMAPRIL 2001 - LETTER TO PIERRE PETTIGREW, MINISTER OF INTERNATIONAL TRADE REGARDING INVESTOR PROTECTION PROVISIONS IN NAFTA AND THE PROPOSED FTAA - LETTER TO CANADA CUSTOMS AND REVENUE AGENCY RE: DRAFT INFORMATION CIRCULAR 01-1-THIRD PARTY CIVIL PENALTIESMAY 2001 - LETTER TO ALFONSO GAGLIANO, MINISTER OF PUBLIC WORKS AND GOVERNMENT SERVICES RE: CONCERNS WITH LACK OF FEDERAL ACTION IN THE CREATION OF NATIONAL HOUSING POLICY |
Objets poursuivis : Renseignements prospectifs : | MAY CONTACT THE MINISTER OF INDUSTRY BRIAN TOBIN REGARDING BILL C-23, COMPETITION ACT AMENDMENTS MAY CONTACT THE MINISTER OF INDUSTRY BRIAN TOBIN REGARDING INSOLVENCY LAW REFORMMAY CONTACT MEMBERS OF CABINET, GTA AREA MP'S AND DEPUTY MINISTER FOR MISSION TO OTTAWA REGARDING E-COMMERCE, TAXATION AND INFRASTRUCTURE MAY CONTACT JUDY SGRO, CHAIR AND OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PM CANCUS TASK FORCE ON URBAN ISSUES, CITY COMPETITIVENESS AND FEDERAL INITIATIVESMAY CONTACT DAVID COLLENETTE, MINISTER OF TRANSPORTATION REGARDING AIRLINE COMPETITION AND RAIL LINK FRON UNION STATION TO AIRPORT (LBPIA) |