MAC is the national organization of the metals and minerals industry. Its Members are engaged in mineral exploration, extraction, beneficiation, smelting, refining and other processing of metallic and non-metallic minerals. MAC represents the interests of its members at the national and international levels and liaises with other mining industry associations, foreign, national, provincial and territorial. MAC responds to enquiries from the public, media and government and provides a vehicle for joint and voluntary action by its member firms. The Association advises government institiutions and public office holders regarding the impact of policies, legislation and regulations on the Canadian metals and minerals industry.
PIERRE GRATTON, President & Chief Executive Officer
Adresse :
1100-275 Slater Street
Ottawa, ON K1P 5H9
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-233-9392
Poste
318
Numéro de fax :
613-233-8897
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
The Mining Association of Canada (MAC)/L'association minière du Canada (AMC) | 2024-04-04 | actuel |
The Mining Association of Canada (MAC)/L'association minière du Canada (AMC) | 2008-08-12 | 2024-04-04 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
PIERRE GRATTON | 2011-06-01 | Actuel |
Gordon Peeling | 1998-01-28 | 2011-06-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director General,
Immigration, Refugees and Citizenship Canada, Refugee Affairs |
mars 2021 à mai 2022 | Pas une charge désignée |
Various
Natural Resources Canada, Policy and Economics Branch |
novembre 2014 à mars 2021 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Physical Science Senior Officer (PC-04)
Environment Canada, Mining and Processing Division |
juin 2014 à avril 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Section Head, Regulatory Development, Mining (PC-04)
Environment Canada, Mining and Processing Division |
août 2008 à juin 2014 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Program Officer, Mining Standards (PC - 03)
Environment Canada, Minerals and Metals Division |
juin 2002 à août 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Evaluator (PC-03)
Environment Canada, Existing Substances Branch |
2001 à juin 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Environmental Effects Monitoring Specialist (PC-03)
Environment Canada, National EEM Office |
1996 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Network Design Officer (PC-02)
Environment Canada, Evaluation and Interpretation Branch |
décembre 1992 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, MP Office |
janvier 2006 à novembre 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant to the Parliamentary Secreatary
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
juin 2005 à janvier 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, MP Office |
septembre 2004 à mai 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant to the Minister of Citizenship and Immigration
Citizenship and Immigration, Minister's Office |
janvier 2004 à juillet 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, MP Office |
septembre 1999 à janvier 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Head, Community Development
National Museum of Science and Technology, Marketing |
1993 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Advertising and Promotions Officer
National Museum of Science and Technology, Marketing |
1992 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief, Management Practices
National Museum of Science and Technology, Personnel |
1988 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Corporate Secretary
National Museum of Science and Technology, Director's Office |
1988 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Acting Director, Personnel
National Museum of Science and Technology, Personnel |
1987 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Personnel Generalist
National Museums of Canada, Personal Services |
1983 à 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief, Human Resources
National Museums of Canada, Personnel Services |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Staffing Officer
Finance Canada, Personnel |
1980 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Organization and Methods Analyst
Finance Canada, Management Practices |
1979 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Organization and Methods Analyst
Labour Canada, Management Improvement |
1975 à 1979 | Pas une charge désignée |
Projects Assistant
Labour Canada, Management Improvement |
1972 à 1975 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Sr. Policy Advisor
Natural Resources Canada, Metals and Minerals Sector |
janvier 2009 à avril 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General and Minister of Justice |
juin 1997 à juin 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Press Secretary
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's office |
juin 1996 à juin 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Deputy Director
Natural Resources Canada, International Affairs and Trade |
juillet 2018 à novembre 2019 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Natural Resources Canada, International Affairs and Trade |
octobre 2016 à juillet 2018 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Natural Resources Canada, Intergovernmental Affairs |
octobre 2015 à octobre 2016 | Pas une charge désignée |