MAC is the national organization of the metals and minerals industry. Its Members are engaged in mineral exploration, extraction, beneficiation, smelting, refining and other processing of metallic and non-metallic minerals. MAC represents the interests of its members at the national and international levels and liaises with other mining industry associations, foreign, national, provincial and territorial. MAC responds to enquiries from the public, media and government and provides a vehicle for joint and voluntary action by its member firms. The Association advises government institiutions and public office holders regarding the impact of policies, legislation and regulations on the Canadian metals and minerals industry.
Gordon Peeling, President & CEO
Address:
1105 - 350 Sparks Street
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-233-9391
Fax number:
613-233-8897
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The Mining Association of Canada (MAC)/L'association minière du Canada (AMC) | 2024-04-04 | current |
The Mining Association of Canada (MAC)/L'association minière du Canada (AMC) | 2008-08-12 | 2024-04-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
PIERRE GRATTON | 2011-06-01 | Current |
Gordon Peeling | 1998-01-28 | 2011-06-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Marketing Officer
Parks Canada, National Parks Branch |
1982 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager/Chief of Mineral Sector and a second position as Advisor, Advanced Materials in Policy Sector
Industry Canada, Mineral Sector and the Advanced Materials in Policy Sector |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Director of Technology Transfer
Energy, Mines and Resources, Canada Center for Mineral and Energy Technology (CANMET) |
1984 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Consumer & Corporate Affairs, Minister's Office |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
Minister of State for Mines, Minister's Office |
1980 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant and Communications Assistant
Industry, Office of The Hon John Manley, Minister |
2000 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, MP's Office |
1994 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Mineral Resources
Indian & Northern Affairs Canada, Northern Affairs Program |
1998 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General
Natural Resources Canada, Mineral & Metals Commodities Branch |
1992 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Natural Resources Canada, Mineral Strategy Branch |
1989 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Director
Natural Resources Canada, Internatinal Mineral Relations |
1982 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Mineral Economist
Energy Mines and Resources, Minerals and Metals Commodities Branch |
1974 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Minister of Transportation, Office of the Hon. Jean-C Lapierre |
2004 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Manager
Export Development Canada, Environmental Exports Initiative |
2002 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Natural Resources Canada, Office of the Hon. Anne McLellan, Minister |
1996 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
International Trade, Office of Hon Pierre Pettigrew and Hon Sergio Marchi |
1987 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Marketing Officer
Parks Canada, National Parks Branch |
1982 to 1986 | Not a designated office |