Canadian Diabetes Association promotes the health of Canadians through diabetes research, education, service and advocacy. Programs conducted include: 1) research grants and awards to qualified donees; 2) professional & advocacy publications; 3) educational publications, magazines and newsletters; 4) nutrition guides and cookbooks; 5) support to health care professionals to further education in diabetes care; 6) support groups; 7) camping services to children in which they learn to live with diabetes more successfully; 8) Corporate Food Value Symbols programmes on consumer food products; 9) support elimination of blanket discrimination of those affected by diabetes; 10) support and administer government programmes designed to aid those in need with required supplies; 11) provide supplies required by those affected by diabetes at competitive prices and enhanced services; 12) advocate/negotiate for access to care and services; 13) development of guidelines for standard of diabetes care; 14) provide a network of community access for those affected by diabetes.
Rick Blickstead, President and Chief Executive Officer
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2014-08-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Agence de la santé publique du Canada (ASPC) | 22 750,00 $ | Non |
Agence de la santé publique du Canada (ASPC) | 433,00 $ | Non |
Federal Economic Development Agency for Southern Ontario | 2 923,00 $ | Non |
Federal - HRDC Grants for Summer Student | 136 509,00 $ | Oui |
Government of Alberta (Monitors) | 3 422 054,00 $ | Oui |
Government of Ontario (Monitors) | 1 165 210,00 $ | Oui |
Govt. of BC - PHSA for Food Skills for Families | 458 812,00 $ | Oui |
Govt. of Canada - HRSDC (Employment & Social Development) | 5 000,00 $ | Non |
Govt. of NB - Live Well/Bien vivre | 387 059,00 $ | Oui |
Govt. of NL Health Dept. for Peer to Peer | 36 778,00 $ | Non |
Manitoba Health Camp Grant | 10 100,00 $ | Oui |
Manitoba Lotteries Corporation | 3 000,00 $ | Oui |
Municipal Grant - City of Peterborough | 5 000,00 $ | Non |
Northern Ontario Heritage Fund Internship Grants | 69 504,83 $ | Oui |
Ontario Banting House Garden and Structural | 2 000,00 $ | Non |
Provincial Grant - BC Terr-YK DHSS-Food Skills for Families | 9 863,00 $ | Non |
Saskatchewan Liquor and Gaming Authority | 26,75 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
522 University Avenue
Suite 1400
Toronto, ON M5G 2R5
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
416-408-7020
Numéro de fax :
416-408-7015
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Diabetes Canada/Diabète Canada | 2024-04-17 | actuel |
Diabetes Canada/Diabète Canada | 2018-01-01 | 2024-04-17 |
Canadian Diabetes Association/ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DU DIABETE | 2008-11-30 | 2018-01-01 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Laura Syron | 2020-06-29 | Actuel |
RUSSELL WILLIAMS | 2020-02-03 | 2020-06-29 |
Jan Hux | 2018-09-06 | 2020-02-03 |
John Reidy | 2018-01-01 | 2018-09-06 |
Rick Blickstead | 2013-10-01 | 2018-01-01 |
Doug Macnamara | 2013-02-08 | 2013-10-01 |
Michael Cloutier | 2010-07-05 | 2013-02-08 |
Ellen Malcolmson | 2008-11-30 | 2010-07-05 |
Michael Howlett | 2006-05-08 | 2008-04-18 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Minister of Labour, Office of the Minister |
avril 1990 à août 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Minister of Transport, Office of the Minister |
avril 1990 à août 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Hon. John Fraser, Speaker of the House of Commons |
avril 1989 à mars 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Richard Grisé M.P. |
mars 1985 à avril 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Research Officer
House of Commons, NDP Research Group |
février 1992 à août 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Steve Butland, MP |
mars 1989 à février 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Howard McCurdy, MP |
août 1988 à mars 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Epidemiologist
Health Canada, Laboratory Centre for Disease Control (LCDC) |
octobre 1999 à mars 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Minister of Labour, Office of the Minister |
avril 1990 à août 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Minister of Transport, Office of the Minister |
avril 1990 à août 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Hon. John Fraser, Speaker of the House of Commons |
avril 1989 à mars 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Richard Grisé M.P. |
mars 1985 à avril 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |