Total Number of Communication Reports: 80
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Canadian Tire Corporation, Limited (TSX:CTC.a) (TSX:CTC) is one of Canada’s most-shopped general retailers and the country’s largest sporting goods retailer, with more than 1,700 retail and gasoline outlets from coast-to-coast. Our primary retail business categories – Automotive, Living, Fixing, Playing and Apparel – are supported and strengthened by our Financial Services division, which offers such products and services as credit cards, retail deposits, in-store financing, product warranties, and insurance. Nearly 68,000 people are employed across the Canadian Tire enterprise, which was founded in 1922 and remains one of Canada’s most recognized and trusted brands.
Stephen Wetmore, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
2180 Yonge Street
Toronto, ON M4P 2V8
Canada
Telephone number:
416-480-8414
Fax number:
416-480-8168
Canadian Tire Corporation, Limited / Société Canadian Tire Limitée is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Tire Corporation, Limited/Société Canadian Tire Limitée | 2008-07-02 | 2020-07-16 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Stephen Wetmore | 2016-07-13 | 2020-07-16 |
Michael Medline | 2014-12-01 | 2016-07-13 |
Stephen Wetmore | 2009-01-01 | 2014-12-01 |
Tom Gauld | 2006-06-07 | 2009-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant - Policy and Research
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, Minister's Office |
February 2003 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Program and Policy Advisor
Office of Secretary to the Governor General, Program and Policy |
January 2002 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Communications Advisor
DFO, Aquaculture |
August 2001 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
HRDC, Learning and Literacy Secretariat |
January 2001 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant - Policy and Research
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, Minister's Office |
February 2003 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Program and Policy Advisor
Office of Secretary to the Governor General, Program and Policy |
January 2002 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Communications Advisor
DFO, Aquaculture |
August 2001 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
HRDC, Learning and Literacy Secretariat |
January 2001 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |