Subject matters | Details | Categories |
---|---|---|
Transportation
|
Consolidation of Rail crossing policies under the Minister of Transport
|
Policies or Program
|
Labour, Transportation
|
Government action to ensure labour stability in Canadian supply chains
|
Policies or Program
|
Infrastructure, Transportation
|
Infrastructure projects, including those that support Canada’s supply chains, enable trade, and improve safety.
|
Policies or Program
|
Infrastructure, Transportation
|
Issues concerning railway safety, operations and investment
|
Policies or Program
|
Labour, Transportation
|
Legislative changes to the Canada Labour Code to provide the government the tools necessary to protect Canadian supply chain stability.
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution
|
Transportation
|
Regulations under the Canada Transportation Act and Railway Safety Act.
|
Legislative Proposal, Bill or Resolution
|
Transportation
|
Regulations under the Canada Transportation Act and Railway Safety Act.
|
Regulation
|
International Trade, Transportation
|
Regulatory and policy alignment between Canada and the U.S.
|
Regulation
|
Transportation
|
Revisions to Safety Regulations and Rules (Infrastructure, Equipment or Operations) under the Railway Safety Act.
|
Regulation
|
Transportation
|
Revision to the Employee drug testing to further improve rail safety
|
Regulation
|
Transportation
|
Revision to the Railway Employee Qualification Regulations"
|
Regulation
|
Canadian Pacific Kansas City Limited (TSX: CP.TO) is a single-line rail network connecting Canada, the U.S. and Mexico. Canadian Pacific Railway Company is a subsidiary of Canadian Pacific Kansas City Limited. It is headquartered in Calgary, Alberta.
Keith Creel, President & CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Emissions Reduction Alberta | $2,050,301.21 | Yes |
Transport Canada (TC) | $9,804,383.29 | Yes |
Address:
81 Metcalfe Street
Suite 1110
Ottawa, ON K1P 6K7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-237-1570
Fax number:
613-237-1575
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Pacific Railway Company/ | 2024-04-11 | current |
Canadian Pacific Railway Company/ | 2019-03-25 | 2024-04-11 |
Canadian Pacific Railway/Chemin de fer Canadien Pacifique | 2008-08-28 | 2019-03-25 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Keith Creel | 2017-01-31 | Current |
E. Hunter Harrison | 2012-07-30 | 2017-01-31 |
Stephen Tobias | 2012-05-17 | 2012-07-30 |
Fred Green | 2006-07-20 | 2012-05-17 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy, Infrastructure Advisor
Infrastructure Canada, Minister's Office |
July 2013 to November 2015 | November 4, 2015 |
Policy, Marine Advisor
Transport Canada, Minister's Office |
May 2011 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Chief of Staff, Policy, Communications and Parliamentary Affairs Advisor
Sport Canada, Minister's office |
March 2009 to May 2011 | May 18, 2011 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Policy and Legal Affairs to the Minister
Citizenship and Immigration, Minister's office |
September 2014 to November 2015 | November 4, 2015 |
Senior Policy Advisor to the Minister
Infrastructure and Intergovernmental Affairs, Minister's office |
July 2013 to September 2014 | September 2, 2014 |
Policy Advisor to the Minister
Transport, Infrastructure and Communities, Minister's Office |
August 2011 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Executive Assistant to the Minister
Small Business and Tourism, Minister's Office |
May 2010 to June 2011 | June 18, 2011 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Senate of Canada, Senator's Office |
January 2020 to October 2021 | Not a designated office |
Senate Caucus Liaison
Senate of Canada, Senator's Office |
April 2018 to December 2019 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Senate of Canada, Senator's Office |
April 2016 to August 2017 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, Member's Office |
February 2016 to April 2016 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Prime Minister's Office, Office of the Chief of Staff |
May 2015 to August 2015 | August 4, 2015 |
Intern
House of Commons, Member's office |
August 2014 to May 2015 | Not a designated office |