Founded in 1913, the Canadian Pulp and Paper Association changed its name to the Forest Products Association of Canada (FPAC) in February 2001. FPAC is the voice of Canada's wood, pulp, and paper producers nationally and internationally in government, trade, and environmental affairs. Canada's forest products industry is a 58 billion dollar a year industry and represents almost 12 percent of Canada's manufacturing GDP. The industry is one of Canada's largest employers, operating in 200 Canadian communities and providing 235,000 direct jobs across the country. L’Association canadienne des pâtes et papiers a été fondé en 1913. En février 2001 le nom fût changé à l’Association des produits forestiers du Canada. L’Association des produits forestiers du Canada (APFC) est le porte-parole, au Canada et à l’étranger, des producteurs canadiens de bois, de pâte et de papier pour les questions touchant le gouvernement, le commerce et l’environnement. L’industrie canadienne des produits forestiers a un chiffre d'affaires de 58 milliards de dollars par année qui représente 12 % du PIB manufacturier. Il s’agit de l’un des plus gros employeurs du pays, qui a des activités dans 200 collectivités canadiennes et procure 235 000 emplois directs d’un océan à l’autre.
Derek Nighbor, CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2015-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $373,542.43 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $1,309,473.90 | Yes |
Address:
410-99 BANK STREET
410-99, rue Bank
OTTAWA, ON K1P 6B9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-1441
Ext.
308
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Forest Products Association of Canada/Association des produits forestiers du Canada | 2024-05-15 | current |
Forest Products Association of Canada/Association des produits forestiers du Canada | 2009-10-30 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Derek Nighbor | 2016-03-07 | Current |
Paul Lansbergen | 2015-12-18 | 2016-03-07 |
David Lindsay | 2012-09-01 | 2015-12-18 |
CATHERINE COBDEN | 2012-04-01 | 2012-09-01 |
AVRIM LAZAR | 2002-05-23 | 2012-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Manager
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada, Communications and Marketing Branch |
2015 Footnote 3 | Not a designated office |
Senior Competition Law Officer
Competition Bureau, Legislative and International Affairs |
2013 to 2015 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Internal Communications and Events
Industry Canada, Communications and Marketing Branch |
2011 to 2013 | Not a designated office |
(Acting) Deputy Commissioner of Competition
Competition Bureau, Public Affairs |
2010 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Industry Canada, Communications and Marketing Branch |
2010 to 2011 | Not a designated office |
Director, Resources,
Industry Canada, Manufacturing and Value-Added Products |
2009 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Task Force Member
FedDev Ontario, Nil |
2009 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Senior Executive Policy Advisor
Industry Canada, Auto |
2008 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Department of Public Works and Government Services, Minister's Office |
July 2004 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Contract Special Projects
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, International Education Marketing |
1999 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Temporary position
Transport Canada, Safety and Security |
January 1998 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Student
Canada Customs and Revenue, Collections and verification |
September 1994 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Student
National Archives, Photography Services |
June 1994 to August 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Project Officer
Environment Canada, Environmental Stewardship Branch |
May 2010 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |
Student
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Eastern Cereal and Oilseed Research Centre |
September 2009 to December 2009 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer
Environment Canada, Environmental Stewardship Branch |
January 2009 to April 2009 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer
Environment Canada, Environmental Stewardship Branch |
May 2008 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Advisor, Species at Risk
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Habitat Program Policy Branch |
March 2007 to June 2007 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant, Tree Pathology
Natural Resources Canada, Pacific Forestry Centre |
May 2000 to September 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Manager
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada, Communications and Marketing Branch |
2015 Footnote 3 | Not a designated office |
Senior Competition Law Officer
Competition Bureau, Legislative and International Affairs |
2013 to 2015 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Internal Communications and Events
Industry Canada, Communications and Marketing Branch |
2011 to 2013 | Not a designated office |
(Acting) Deputy Commissioner of Competition
Competition Bureau, Public Affairs |
2010 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Industry Canada, Communications and Marketing Branch |
2010 to 2011 | Not a designated office |
Director, Resources,
Industry Canada, Manufacturing and Value-Added Products |
2009 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Task Force Member
FedDev Ontario, Nil |
2009 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Senior Executive Policy Advisor
Industry Canada, Auto |
2008 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Employer Representative
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment Insurance Board of Referees |
June 2000 to July 2005 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Industry Canada, Internal Trade Secretariat |
January 1994 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Research Officer
Canadian International Trade Tribunal, Research |
October 1990 to October 1993 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of Natinal Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
May 1990 to August 1990 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
May 1990 to May 1990 | Not a designated office |
contractor
Department of Natinoal Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
December 1989 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Contractor
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel Branch) |
December 1989 to December 1989 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
May 1989 to August 1989 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of National Defence, ADM (Personnel) Branch |
May 1988 to August 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to MP for Hillsborough, PEI
House of Commons, House of Commons |
1995 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Advisor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, United States Trade Policy and Environment Divisions from |
1994 to February 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager
Environment Canada, Waste Program |
September 2007 to March 2011 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director
Environment Canada, Consumer Products Division |
February 2007 to September 2007 | Not a designated office |
Manager
Health Canada, Industrial Sectors |
September 2006 to February 2007 | Not a designated office |
Section Head
Environment Canada, Pulp and Paper |
August 2004 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Process Engineer
Environment Canada, Pulp and Paper |
July 2003 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Process Engineer
Environment Canada, Water Section |
June 2002 to July 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Industry Canada, Competition Bureau |
May 2013 to June 2013 | Not a designated office |
Mailroom Clerk
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
February 2013 to March 2013 | Not a designated office |
FSWEP Student
Public Works and Goverment Services Canada, Acquisition Branch |
January 2012 to December 2012 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Business Risk Management Branch |
July 2009 to September 2010 | Not a designated office |