Founded in 1913, the Canadian Pulp and Paper Association changed its name to the Forest Products Association of Canada (FPAC) in February 2001. FPAC is the voice of Canada's wood, pulp, and paper producers nationally and internationally in government, trade, and environmental affairs. Canada's forest industry represents almost 2 percent of Canada's GDP and exports over $23 billion annually. The industry is one of Canada's largest employers, operating in hundreds of Canadian communities and providing 600,000 direct and indirect jobs across the country. With the assistance of member companies, FPAC designs programs to promote Canada's leadership in trade and economic matters, sustainable forest management and environmental stewardship. L’Association canadienne des pâtes et papiers a été fondé en 1913. En février 2002 le nom fût changé à l’Association des produits forestiers du Canada. L’Association des produits forestiers du Canada (APFC) est le porte-parole, au Canada et à l’étranger, des producteurs canadiens de bois, de pâte et de papier pour les questions touchant le gouvernement, le commerce et l’environnement. L’industrie canadienne des produits forestiers représente 2 % du PIB et exporte plus de 23 milliards de dollars chaque année. Il s’agit de l’un des plus gros employeurs du pays, qui a des activités dans plus de 300 collectivités canadiennes et procure 725 000 emplois directs et indirects d’un océan à l’autre. Avec l’aide de ses membres, l’APFC conçoit des programmes visant à promouvoir l’action de chef de file du Canada dans le domaine commercial et économique, de l’aménagement forestier durable et de l’intendance de l’environnement.
CATHERINE COBDEN, PRESIDENT
End date of the last completed financial year: 2011-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Government of alberta | $139,001.53 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $4,837,001.61 | Yes |
Address:
410-99 BANK STREET
410-99, rue Bank
OTTAWA, ON K1P 6B9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-238-2090
Fax number:
613-238-9380
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Forest Products Association of Canada/Association des produits forestiers du Canada | 2024-05-15 | current |
Forest Products Association of Canada/Association des produits forestiers du Canada | 2009-10-30 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Derek Nighbor | 2016-03-07 | Current |
Paul Lansbergen | 2015-12-18 | 2016-03-07 |
David Lindsay | 2012-09-01 | 2015-12-18 |
CATHERINE COBDEN | 2012-04-01 | 2012-09-01 |
AVRIM LAZAR | 2002-05-23 | 2012-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to MP for Hillsborough, PEI
House of Commons, House of Commons |
1995 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Communications
Canadian Tourism Commission, Communications |
2001 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications Officer
House of Commons, Public Information Office |
1985 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Advisor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, United States Trade Policy and Environment Divisions from |
1994 to February 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, House of Commons |
2006 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to MP for Hillsborough, PEI
House of Commons, House of Commons |
1995 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student position with Minister of Industry's office
Industry Canada, Industry CAnada |
2003 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer, Department of Industry
Industry Canada, Department of Industry |
2003 to 2004 | Not a designated office |