The new Canadian designation, Chartered Professional Accountant (CPA), is now used by Canada’s accounting profession across the country. The profession’s national body, Chartered Professional Accountants of Canada (CPA Canada), is one of the largest in the world with more than 200,000 members, both at home and abroad. The Canadian CPA was created with the unification of three legacy accounting designations (CA, CGA and CMA). CPAs are valued for their financial and tax expertise, strategic thinking, business insight, management skills and leadership. CPA Canada conducts research into current and emerging business issues and supports the setting of accounting, auditing and assurance standards for business, not-for-profit organizations and government. CPA Canada also issues guidance and thought leadership on a variety of technical matters, publishes professional literature and develops education and professional certification programs. www.cpacanada.ca
Joy Thomas, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2016-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $0.00 | Yes |
Address:
277 Wellington St. W
Toronto, ON M5V 3H2
Canada
Telephone number:
905-949-3100
Fax number:
905-949-0888
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Chartered Professional Accountants of Canada (CPA Canada)/Comptables professionnels agréés du Canada (CPA Canada) | 2024-04-01 | current |
Chartered Professional Accountants of Canada (CPA Canada)/Comptables professionnels agréés du Canada (CPA Canada) | 2013-04-01 | 2024-04-01 |
The Canadian Institute of Chartered Accountants/L’Institut Canadien des Comptables Agréés | 2008-08-22 | 2013-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Pamela Steer | 2022-04-19 | Current |
Richard Olfert | 2022-04-01 | 2022-04-19 |
Charles-Antoine St-Jean | 2020-07-20 | 2022-04-01 |
Joy Thomas | 2016-04-01 | 2020-07-20 |
Kevin Dancey | 2006-08-22 | 2016-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst
Transport Canada, Security and Emergency Preparedness |
January 2007 to April 2007 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister |
December 2003 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Caucus Liaison
Public Works and Government Services, Office of the Minister |
October 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the MP for Chatham-Kent-Essex |
September 1997 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the MP for Burin-St.George's |
January 1991 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Senate of Canada, Office of the Late Hon. Paul Lucier |
1988 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Examiner
Office of the Superintendant of Financial Institutions, Property and Casualty Division |
1991 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Audit Intern
Office of the Auditor General of Canada, Audit Services |
May 2009 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |