The Chartered Professional Accountants of Canada (CPA Canada) is the national organization representing the Chartered Professional Accountant (CPA) profession in Canada. The Canadian Institute of Chartered Accountants (CICA) and The Society of Management Accountants of Canada (CMA Canada) created the organization on January 1, 2013, to support unification of the Canadian accounting profession under the CPA banner. CPA Canada conducts research into current business issues and supports the setting of accounting, auditing and assurance standards for business, not-for-profit organizations and government. It issues guidance on control and governance, publishes professional literature and develops continuing education programs.
Kevin Dancey, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2014-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $463,599.00 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $0.00 | Yes |
Address:
277 Wellington St. W
Toronto, ON M5V 3H2
Canada
Telephone number:
416-977-3222
Fax number:
416-977-8585
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Chartered Professional Accountants of Canada (CPA Canada)/Comptables professionnels agréés du Canada (CPA Canada) | 2024-04-01 | current |
Chartered Professional Accountants of Canada (CPA Canada)/Comptables professionnels agréés du Canada (CPA Canada) | 2013-04-01 | 2024-04-01 |
The Canadian Institute of Chartered Accountants/L’Institut Canadien des Comptables Agréés | 2008-08-22 | 2013-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Pamela Steer | 2022-04-19 | Current |
Richard Olfert | 2022-04-01 | 2022-04-19 |
Charles-Antoine St-Jean | 2020-07-20 | 2022-04-01 |
Joy Thomas | 2016-04-01 | 2020-07-20 |
Kevin Dancey | 2006-08-22 | 2016-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister of Finance
Ministry of Finance, Tax Policy Branch |
July 1993 to April 1995 | Not a designated office |
Special Advisor to the Assistant Deputy Minister of Finance
Ministry of Finance, Tax Policy Branch |
July 1985 to June 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst
Transport Canada, Security and Emergency Preparedness |
January 2007 to April 2007 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister |
December 2003 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Caucus Liaison
Public Works and Government Services, Office of the Minister |
October 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the MP for Chatham-Kent-Essex |
September 1997 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the MP for Burin-St.George's |
January 1991 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Senate of Canada, Office of the Late Hon. Paul Lucier |
1988 to 1989 | Not a designated office |