Chartered Professional Accountants of Canada (CPA Canada) is one of the largest national accounting organizations in the world, representing more than 210,000 members. Domestically, CPA Canada works cooperatively with the regional CPA bodies who are charged with regulating the profession. Globally, it works together with the International Federation of Accountants and the Global Accounting Alliance to build a stronger accounting profession worldwide. CPA Canada, created through the unification of three legacy accounting designations, is a respected voice in the business, government, education and non-profit sectors and champions sustainable economic growth and social development. The unified organization is celebrating five years of serving the profession, advocating for the public interest and supporting the setting of accounting, auditing and assurance standards. CPA Canada develops leading-edge thought leadership, research, guidance and educational programs to ensure its members are equipped to drive success and shape the future. cpacanada.ca
Joy Thomas, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2018-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Business Development Bank of Canada / Banque de développement du Canada (BDC) – Note: This late entry was added on 2019-07-08 by the OCL / Cette entrée tardive a été ajoutée le 08-07-2019 par le CAL | $17,246.25 | Yes |
Business Development Bank of Canada (BDC) | $0.00 | Yes |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $624,995.00 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $0.00 | Yes |
Address:
277 Wellington St. W
Toronto, ON M5V 3H2
Canada
Telephone number:
416-977-3222
Fax number:
416-977-8585
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Chartered Professional Accountants of Canada (CPA Canada)/Comptables professionnels agréés du Canada (CPA Canada) | 2024-04-01 | current |
Chartered Professional Accountants of Canada (CPA Canada)/Comptables professionnels agréés du Canada (CPA Canada) | 2013-04-01 | 2024-04-01 |
The Canadian Institute of Chartered Accountants/L’Institut Canadien des Comptables Agréés | 2008-08-22 | 2013-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Pamela Steer | 2022-04-19 | Current |
Richard Olfert | 2022-04-01 | 2022-04-19 |
Charles-Antoine St-Jean | 2020-07-20 | 2022-04-01 |
Joy Thomas | 2016-04-01 | 2020-07-20 |
Kevin Dancey | 2006-08-22 | 2016-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economic Analyst
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada, Data and Digital Programming Branch |
October 2016 to May 2018 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Canada Mortgage and Housing Corporation, Housing Finance Policy Division |
May 2015 to October 2016 | Not a designated office |
Junior Policy Analyst (COOP)
Federal Economic Development Agency for Southern Ontario, Strategic Policy Directorate |
May 2013 to August 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Finance Analyst
External Affairs, Finance |
1990 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Clerk
Energy, Mines and Resources, Staffing |
1974 to 1977 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst
Transport Canada, Security and Emergency Preparedness |
January 2007 to April 2007 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister |
December 2003 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Caucus Liaison
Public Works and Government Services, Office of the Minister |
October 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the MP for Chatham-Kent-Essex |
September 1997 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the MP for Burin-St.George's |
January 1991 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Senate of Canada, Office of the Late Hon. Paul Lucier |
1988 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager Business Structures & Financing
Atomic Energy of Canada Limited, Marketing and Sales Department |
November 2000 to April 2006 | Not a designated office |
Financing Consultant
Atomic Energy of Canada Limited, Marketing and Sales Department |
November 1997 to November 2000 | Not a designated office |
Internal Auditor
Atomic Energy of Canada Limited, Internal Audit Department |
November 1996 to November 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economic Analyst
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada, Data and Digital Programming Branch |
October 2016 to May 2018 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Canada Mortgage and Housing Corporation, Housing Finance Policy Division |
May 2015 to October 2016 | Not a designated office |
Junior Policy Analyst (COOP)
Federal Economic Development Agency for Southern Ontario, Strategic Policy Directorate |
May 2013 to August 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Audit Intern
Office of the Auditor General of Canada, Audit Services |
May 2009 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |