Manufacture and sale of fuel ethanol and high-grade industrial and beverage alcohols.
Howard Field, President and CEO
Address:
20 Toronto Street
14th Floor
Toronto, ON M5C 2B8
Canada
Telephone number:
416-304-1700
Ext.
8526
Fax number:
416-304-1701
Greenfield Global Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Greenfield Global Inc./ | 2024-05-03 | current |
Greenfield Global Inc./ | 2017-05-31 | 2024-05-03 |
GreenField Specialty Alcohols Inc./Les Alcools de Spécialité GreenField Inc. | 2013-09-25 | 2017-05-31 |
GreenField Ethanol Inc./Éthanol GreenField inc. | 2008-08-11 | 2013-09-25 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Howard Field | 2016-08-11 | Current |
Robert Gallant | 2006-12-22 | 2016-08-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs and Issues Management
Department of Public Safety, Minister's Office |
January 2010 to May 2011 | May 25, 2011 |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Treasury Board Secretariat, Office of the President of the Treasury Board |
June 2009 to January 2010 | January 19, 2010 |
Director of Communications
Canada Revenue Agency, Minister's Office |
October 2008 to June 2009 | June 1, 2009 |
Director of Policy
Department of Labour, Minister's Office |
September 2007 to October 2008 | October 30, 2008 |