Communitech is a member-based organization driving the growth and success of Waterloo Region's technology sector. We advocate on behalf of our membership and promote our success stories to raise awareness of Waterloo Region as a world-class technology hub.We offer services to our members to help them connect with their peers, raise capital, and find expert advice, market research, and talent.
Iain Klugman, President and CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2017-06-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $379,743.00 | No |
City of Kitchener | $330,000.00 | Yes |
City of Waterloo | $370,000.00 | Yes |
Federal Economic Development Agency for Southern Ontario (FedDev) | $1,009,483.00 | Yes |
MaRS (Business Acceleration Program) | $994,000.00 | Yes |
Ministry of Economic Development, Job Creation and Trade (Regional Innovation Centre) | $950,000.00 | Yes |
Ministry of Economic Development, Job Creation and Trade (YKF) | $400,000.00 | Yes |
Ministry of Research and Innovation (Sector Innovation Centre) | $13,500,000.00 | Yes |
National Research Council (NRC) | $2,567,128.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $520,883.00 | No |
Ontario Centres of Excellence | $140,000.00 | Yes |
Regional Municipality of Waterloo | $30,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $404,246.00 | No |
Status of Women Canada (SWC) | $6,000.00 | No |
Address:
151 Charles St W Ste 100
The Tannery
Kitchener, ON N2G 1H6
Canada
Telephone number:
519-888-9944
Ext.
2022
Fax number:
519-804-2225
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Communitech Corporation/ | 2024-03-04 | current |
Communitech Corporation/ | 2019-09-12 | 2024-03-04 |
Communitech Technology Association | 2014-02-21 | 2019-09-12 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Chris Albinson | 2021-05-17 | Current |
Iain Klugman | 2007-02-07 | 2021-05-17 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Spokesperson and Counsellor (Public Affairs)
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Embassy of Canada to the United States |
August 2011 to August 2013 | Not a designated office |
Second Secretary
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Permanent Mission of Canada to the United Nations |
August 2007 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Assistant Deputy Minister of Global Issues
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Global Issues |
August 2006 to August 2007 | Not a designated office |
Policy Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Environmental Affairs |
August 2004 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, US Transboundary Division |
March 2003 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Strategic Communications Group, Intergovernmental Affairs
Privy Council Office, Intergovernmental Affairs |
1993 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Stakeholder Communications and Relationship Management
Human Resources Development Canada, Strategic Communications Branch |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Marketing Communications Officer for External Recruitment Programs
Public Service Commission of Canada, Staffing and Executive Programs Branch |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Spokesperson and Counsellor (Public Affairs)
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Embassy of Canada to the United States |
August 2011 to August 2013 | Not a designated office |
Second Secretary
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Permanent Mission of Canada to the United Nations |
August 2007 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Assistant Deputy Minister of Global Issues
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Global Issues |
August 2006 to August 2007 | Not a designated office |
Policy Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Environmental Affairs |
August 2004 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, US Transboundary Division |
March 2003 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Briefing Officer
Solicitor General of Canada, Coordination and Liaison |
September 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of Lynn Myers, Member of Parliament, House of Commons |
January 2001 to September 2001 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of Jean Augustine, Member of Parliament, House of Commons |
2001 to 2001 | Not a designated office |