The Greater Toronto Airports Authority (GTAA) is a private, not-for-profit corporation mandated to manage and operate Toronto Pearson International Airport within a regional system of airports to enhance the economic growth and development of southern Ontario.
Howard Eng, President & Chief Executive Officer
Address:
3111 Convair Drive
Mississauga, ON L5P 1B2
Canada
Telephone number:
416-776-3344
Fax number:
416-776-3339
Greater Toronto Airports Authority / Autorité aéroportuaire du Grand Toronto is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Greater Toronto Airports Authority/Autorité aéroportuaire du Grand Toronto | 2024-05-13 | current |
Greater Toronto Airports Authority/Autorité aéroportuaire du Grand Toronto | 2008-07-02 | 2024-05-13 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Deborah Flint | 2020-02-03 | Current |
Howard Eng | 2012-03-29 | 2020-02-03 |
Lloyd McCoomb | 2007-02-05 | 2012-03-29 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager of Student Program, Sandspit Airport (student position)
Transport Canada, Sandspit, BC |
1982 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Groundside Operations
Transport Canada, Toronto - Lester B. Pearson International Airport |
1991 to December 1996 | Not a designated office |
Terminal 3 Development Project Team Member
Transport Canada, Toronto - Lester B. Pearson International Airport |
1985 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Superintendent, Airport Planning
Transport Canada, Toronto - Lester B. Pearson International Airport |
1981 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Superintendent, Facilitation
Transport Canada, Toronto - Lester B. Pearson International Airport |
1979 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Superintendent, Maintenance Control
Transport Canada, Toronto - Lester B. Pearson International Airport |
1977 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Maintenance Scheduler
Canada Post, Toronto |
1975 to 1977 | Not a designated office |
Clerk/Off-Set Press Operator
Ministry Of Energy, Mines and Resources, Ottawa |
1973 to 1973 | Not a designated office |
Census Clerk (Temp)
Statistics Canada, Ottawa |
1971 to 1971 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student, Experimental Farm Information Booth
Agriculture Canada, Ottawa, ON |
1984 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Clerk, Pass/Permit Office (casual)
Transport Canada, Toronto-Lester B. Pearson International Airport |
September 1996 to December 1996 | Not a designated office |