The PSAC aims to unite all workers within its area of jurisdiction into a single organization in order to obtain the best standards of compensation and other conditions of employment for its members and to protect and enhance the rights and interests of all workers.
John Gordon, National President
Address:
233 Gilmour Street, Suite 1100
Ottawa, ON K2P 0P1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-560-4330
Fax number:
613-567-0385
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Public Service Alliance of Canada/Alliance de la Fonction publique du Canada | 2024-04-15 | current |
Public Service Alliance of Canada/Alliance de la Fonction publique du Canada | 2008-08-14 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Sharon DeSousa | 2024-06-01 | Current |
Chris Aylward | 2019-04-01 | 2024-06-01 |
Robyn Benson | 2012-06-04 | 2018-11-16 |
John Gordon | 2007-02-09 | 2012-06-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
AS-3 Chief administrative services
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Administrative services, Montréal District |
June 1999 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |
CR-5 Analyst
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Client Services |
June 1998 to June 1999 | Not a designated office |
CR-4 Finance Officer
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance Section |
January 1995 to June 1998 | Not a designated office |
CR-4 Cleark
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance |
April 1989 to June 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PM3 Program Operation Consultant
Service Canada, Programs & Services |
2001 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
PM2 Program Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment Insurance |
1997 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
PM1 Employment & Insurance Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Unemployment Insurance |
1995 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Service Delivery Representative
Canada Employment & Immigration Canada, Social Insurance Number Registration |
1994 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
CR3 General Clerk
Canada Imployment & Immigration Canada, Social Insurance Number Registration |
1980 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PM2
Revenue Canada, Payroll Audit Section |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
PM1
Revenue Canada, Enquiries and Office Examination |
1984 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Clerk
Revenue Canada, Assessment Division |
1984 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PM3 Unregistered and Non-Resident Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Revenue Collection |
2003 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
PM2 Unregistered & Non Resident Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Revenue Collection |
2002 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
PM2 Audit, Benefits Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Revenue Collection |
1995 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
PM2 Recovery Officer
Revenue Canada, Revenue Collection |
1992 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
PM1 Recovery Officer
Revenue Canada, Revenue Collection |
1988 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR File Clerk
Veterans Affairs Canada, Central Registry and Medical Benefits |
1982 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PM1 Recovery Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Recovery Collection |
1996 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Information Clerk
Service Canada, Security Section |
1992 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Clerk, CR4
Revenue Canada, Client Services |
November 1991 to April 1992 | Not a designated office |
Clerk, CR4
Revenue Canada, Client Services |
January 1991 to April 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Clerk
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, Fleet Management |
January 2001 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Detachment Clerk
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, Rural Detachment |
1994 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Plumber
Public Works Canada, Trades Shop |
February 1974 to February 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PM3
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Enforcement Office, Immigration |
2003 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
PM2 Admission Officer
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Immigration |
January 1988 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
AS5 Policy Analyst, Project Officer, AS6 Business Representative for Offender Management System
Correctional Service of Canada, National Headquarters |
December 2003 to June 2008 | Not a designated office |
WP4 Parole Officer
Correctional Service of Canada, Edmonton Parole Office |
June 1995 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Parole Officer and WP4 Assistant to Regional Coordinator
Correctional Service Canada, Red Deer Parole Office/Bowden Institution |
October 1988 to June 1995 | Not a designated office |
Recreation Superviror, Basic Literacy Teacher and Acting Education Coordinator
Government of the Northwest Territories, Yellowknife Correctional Centre |
September 1985 to October 1988 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Office Manager
Correctional Service of Canada, Yellowknife Parole Office |
June 1983 to September 1985 | Not a designated office |
CR3 Clerk
Transport Canada, Human Resources |
August 1982 to June 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
AS-3 Chief administrative services
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Administrative services, Montréal District |
June 1999 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |
CR-5 Analyst
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Client Services |
June 1998 to June 1999 | Not a designated office |
CR-4 Finance Officer
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance Section |
January 1995 to June 1998 | Not a designated office |
CR-4 Cleark
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance |
April 1989 to June 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR3 Proof Reader/file clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Collections Div. |
1976 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
CR 2 Registered Mail Clerk
Revenue Canada, Records Management Division |
1973 to 1974 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PI-4 Supervisor of grain inspectors
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
February 2000 to May 2000 | Not a designated office |
PI-5 Supervisor of grain inspectors
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
January 2000 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
Supervisor of grain inspectors
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
May 1983 to December 1999 | Not a designated office |
PI-4 Grain Inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
March 1982 to December 1982 | Not a designated office |
PI-3 Grain Inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
January 1981 to February 1982 | Not a designated office |
PI-2 Grain Inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
June 1978 to January 1979 | Not a designated office |
PI-2 Grain Inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
February 1977 to August 1977 | Not a designated office |
PI-1 Grain inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
April 1975 to February 1977 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
s/o
Yukon Territorial Government, Firefighting |
1995 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
s/o
Transport Canada, Airport |
1990 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
s/o
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Forestry |
1983 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
s/o
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Forestry |
1978 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR4 Assistant to Hearings
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Refugee Commission |
1999 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Business Finance Clerk
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2001 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
File Clerk
Human Resources Development Canada, Human Resources |
2000 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PM2 Special Needs/Women's Councellor
Canada Employment Centre, Employment Centre |
September 1978 to August 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Storeperson
Parks Canada, Stores |
1983 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Garbage Truck Driver
Parks, s/o |
1981 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Storeperson
Parks Canada, Stores |
1979 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Conservation Corps Superviwor
Parks Canada, s/o |
1977 to 1978 | Not a designated office |
Storeperson
Parks Canada, Stores |
1976 to 1977 | Not a designated office |
Campground Attendant
Parks Canada, s/o |
1975 to 1976 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR3 Filing Clerk
Privy Council, Finance Section |
1991 to January 1997 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Finance Clerk
Privy Council, Finance Section |
1991 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Dairy Cattle Inspector
Agriculture Canada, Rate fo Production |
1977 to February 1978 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Clerk
Agriculture Canada, Rate of Production |
1976 to 1977 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR4 Accommodation Clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Assessment |
1993 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
CR3 Library Clerk
Fisheries and Oceans, Library |
1992 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Tax Assessment Clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Assessment |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Accounts Clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Assessment |
1982 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
CR2 File Clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Assessment |
1981 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR4 Pay and Benefits Clerk
Canada Post Corporation, Pay and Benefits |
1995 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Payroll Clerk
Canada Post Corporation, Payroll |
1991 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Administration Clerk
Canada Post Corporation, Administration |
1987 to February 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Firefighter
Transport Canada, s/o |
1973 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR3 Records Office Clerk
Department of Finance, Records Management |
1980 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
CR2 Mailroom Clerk
Department of Finance, Mailroom |
1977 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
SC-DED-04 Supervisor
Department of National Defence, MARPAC, Queen's Harbour Master at Canadian Forces Base Esquimalt |
September 1972 to February 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR4 Analyst
Canada Post Corporation, Customer Service |
2000 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Analyst
Canada Post Corporation, Customer Service |
1994 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
AS2 Analyst
Canada Post Corporation, Scheduling and Reporting |
1994 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CX01 Correctional Officer
Correctional Services Canada, Public Security |
January 1988 to January 1999 | Not a designated office |
CX02 Correctional Officer
Correctional Services Canada, Public Security |
1984 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Mechanic
Department of National Defence, Supply Depot |
May 1986 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
Mechanic
Department of National Defence, Workshop Depot |
1981 to May 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Postal Clerk (no classification at the time)
Canada Post Corporation, Mailroom |
1976 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Customs Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Customs |
1997 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Customs Officer
Revenue Canada, Customs |
1991 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
GST Registration Officer
Revenue Canada, Customs |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Customs Officer
Canada Customs, Customs |
1983 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
s/o
Treasury Board, Joint Learning Program |
2001 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
AS3 Financal Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2001 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
AS3 Financal Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2001 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
s/o
Treasury Board, Joint Learning Program |
2001 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
CR5 Financial Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2000 to January 2001 | Not a designated office |
CR5 Financial Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2000 to January 2001 | Not a designated office |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
PM1
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
PM1
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
January 1990 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
January 1990 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
CR4
Employment and Insurance Canada, Human Resources |
April 1985 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
CR4
Employment and Insurance Canada, Human Resources |
April 1985 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Councellor
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment |
1985 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Councellor
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment |
1985 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
CR 3
Employment & Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
CR 3
Employment and Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
CR 3
Employment & Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
CR 3
Employment and Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Typist
Unemployment Insurance Canada, Insurance |
1977 to 1978 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PM3 Coordinator
Revenue Canada, Special Projects/Employment Equity |
1999 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
PM3 Coordinator
Revenue Canada, Special Projects/Employment Equity |
1999 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Coordinator (PM 3)
Canada Revenue Agency, Corporation Returns Processing |
1995 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
CR5 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Compliance/Refund Enquiries |
1990 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
CR5 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Compliance/Refund Enquiries |
1990 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
PM2 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Corporation Assessing |
1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
PM2 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Corporation Assessing |
1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Identification Unit |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Identification Unit |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Special Search Unit |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Special Search Unit |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
CR5
Revenue Canada, Registry Units |
January 1983 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
AS1 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Registry Unit |
1983 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
AS1 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Registry Unit |
1983 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
CR5
Revenue Canada, Registry Units |
January 1983 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
CR3 Senior Filing Clerk
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1981 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
CR4
Revenue Canada, File and Retrieval |
1981 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
CR3 Senior Filing Clerk
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1981 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
CR4
Revenue Canada, File and Retrieval |
1981 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
CR3
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
CR3
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1980 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1980 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
EF03 Retial Food Inspector
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Retail Food, Food Safety |
2002 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
PM03 Retail Food Inspector
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Retail Food Safety |
2001 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
AS01 Admin Assistant to Regional Director
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Regional Office |
January 1998 to January 2001 | Not a designated office |
CR04 District Inspection Assistant
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Food Safety |
1997 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
CR04 District Inspection Assistant
Health and Welfare Canada, Health Protection Branch |
1994 to January 1997 | Not a designated office |
SCY02 Secretary
Health and Welfare Canadaq, Health Protection Branch |
1982 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
STN02 Stenographer
Veterans Affairs Canada, Veteran Services |
1981 to January 1982 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR3 Examination Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs, Passport Office |
1997 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Production Clerk
Department of Foreign Affairs, Passport Office |
1995 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PM3
Canada Post Corporation, Accounts Payable |
1986 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
PM2
Canada Post Corporation, Records Management Finance |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
PM1
Canada Post Corporation, Stamp Depot |
1983 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
CR3
Canada Post Corporation, Mailroom |
1978 to January 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
PM2 Technical Resource & Complex Returns Processing Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Corporate Retuns |
November 1991 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
PM2 Supervisor
Revenue Canada, T1 Adjustments |
1984 to October 1991 | Not a designated office |
CR5 Supervisor
Revenue Canada, T1 Adjustments |
1982 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
PM1 T2 Adjustments Officer
Revenue Canada, T2 Adjustments |
July 1981 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
CR4 T1 Adjustment Officer
Revenue Canada, T1 Adjustments |
September 1979 to June 1981 | Not a designated office |
CR2-3 Initial Assessing Clerk
Revenue Canada, Assessing |
February 1979 to June 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
ES4 Research Analyst
Status of Women Canada, s/o |
1995 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
ES4 Research Analyst
Canadian Advisory Council, Status of Women Canada, s/o |
1991 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Heating and Power Engineer
Agriculture Canada, Research Station |
1978 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Auditor
Canada Revenue Agency, Audit |
1983 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Audirot
Revenue Canada, Audit |
1982 to February 1983 | Not a designated office |
Enquiries and Office Examination Officer
Revenue Canada, Enquiries and Office Examination |
1981 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Taxpayer Service Representative
Revenue Canada, Taxpayer Service |
1981 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
EG04
Agriculture Canada, Prairie Farm Rehabilitation Administration |
January 1995 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
EG03
Agriculture Canada, Prairie Farm Rehabilitation Administration |
1982 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
EG01 (term employee)
Agriculture Canada, Prairie Farm Rehabilitation Administration |
1981 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
CR5 Analyst
Service Canada, Security Revenue |
1980 to 1996 | Not a designated office |