The PSAC aims to unite all workers within its area of jurisdiction into a single organization in order to obtain the best standards of compensation and other conditions of employment for its members and to protect and enhance the rights and interests of all workers.
Robyn Benson, National President
Address:
233 Gilmour Street, Suite 1100
Ottawa, ON K2P 0P1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-560-4330
Fax number:
613-567-0385
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Public Service Alliance of Canada/Alliance de la Fonction publique du Canada | 2024-04-15 | current |
Public Service Alliance of Canada/Alliance de la Fonction publique du Canada | 2008-08-14 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Sharon DeSousa | 2024-06-01 | Current |
Chris Aylward | 2019-04-01 | 2024-06-01 |
Robyn Benson | 2012-06-04 | 2018-11-16 |
John Gordon | 2007-02-09 | 2012-06-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
reader services assistant
National Gallery of Canada, Library |
June 1991 to June 2000 | Not a designated office |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Officer
Revenue Canada, Appeals |
1988 à juillet 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Officer
Revenue Canada, I&C |
mars 1984 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Officer
ACDI, Strategic Policy |
septembre 2008 à octobre 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
Officer
National Defense, Policy Section on Afghanistan |
septembre 2007 à septembre 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Officer
National Defense, International Program |
septembre 2006 à septembre 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legal Officer
Treasury Board, Pension Policy Branch |
mai 1992 à septembre 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
health and safety officer
National Capital Commission, Human Resources |
juillet 1992 à juin 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Data Entry Clerk
Revenue Canada, Income Tax |
1968 à 1969 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Clerk
Agriculture Canada, Research |
mai 1982 à mai 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Assistant
National Defence, Meteorological Oceanographic Centre |
juin 1975 à mars 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Assistant
Immigration and Refugee Board, Regional Systems |
décembre 1991 à mars 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
clerk
Customs & Excise, Operations - computer support |
mai 1991 à décembre 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
clerk
CEIC, Computer operations |
avril 1983 à mai 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM3 Program Operation Consultant
Service Canada, Programs & Services |
2001 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Program Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment Insurance |
1997 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Employment & Insurance Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Unemployment Insurance |
1995 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Service Delivery Representative
Canada Employment & Immigration Canada, Social Insurance Number Registration |
1994 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3 General Clerk
Canada Imployment & Immigration Canada, Social Insurance Number Registration |
1980 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Program Officer
Statistics Canada, Official languages division |
mai 1994 à juin 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administrative Agent
Statistics Canada, Regional Operations Division |
août 1990 à mai 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk
Statistics Canada, Official Languages Division |
juin 1981 à mars 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
AS-3 Chief administrative services
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Administrative services, Montréal District |
juin 1999 à août 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR-5 Analyst
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Client Services |
juin 1998 à juin 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR-4 Finance Officer
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance Section |
janvier 1995 à juin 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR-4 Cleark
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance |
avril 1989 à juin 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM2
Revenue Canada, Payroll Audit Section |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Clerk
Revenue Canada, Assessment Division |
1984 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1
Revenue Canada, Enquiries and Office Examination |
1984 à 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Agent
HRSDC, Service Canada, Employment Insurance |
septembre 1997 à novembre 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk
Revenue Canada, Mailroom |
juin 1997 à septembre 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM3 Unregistered and Non-Resident Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Revenue Collection |
2003 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Unregistered & Non Resident Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Revenue Collection |
2002 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Audit, Benefits Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Revenue Collection |
1995 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Recovery Officer
Revenue Canada, Revenue Collection |
1992 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Recovery Officer
Revenue Canada, Revenue Collection |
1988 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR File Clerk
Veterans Affairs Canada, Central Registry and Medical Benefits |
1982 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM1 Recovery Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Recovery Collection |
1996 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Information Clerk
Service Canada, Security Section |
1992 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk, CR4
Revenue Canada, Client Services |
novembre 1991 à avril 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk, CR4
Revenue Canada, Client Services |
janvier 1991 à avril 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Clerk
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, Fleet Management |
janvier 2001 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Detachment Clerk
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, Rural Detachment |
1994 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM3
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Enforcement Office, Immigration |
2003 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Admission Officer
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Immigration |
janvier 1988 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
inspector
Department of Agriculture, Grain Inspection Division |
mai 1971 à avril 1976 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Officer
Department of National Defence, Furniture and Effects |
juin 2001 à mai 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Officer
Department of National Defence, Furniture and Effects |
juin 2001 à mai 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Asssistant to Regional Director General
Health and Welfare Canada, Training & Development |
janvier 1993 à mai 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Guide
Governor General Residence, Governor General |
mai 2003 à avril 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Census worker
Statistics Canada, Census |
avril 2001 à juin 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR3 Filing Clerk
Privy Council, Finance Section |
1991 à janvier 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Finance Clerk
Privy Council, Finance Section |
1991 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Dairy Cattle Inspector
Agriculture Canada, Rate fo Production |
1977 à février 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Clerk
Agriculture Canada, Rate of Production |
1976 à 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
EI officer,employment counselling and adjudication of insurance claims, employment program officer, immigration officer, immigration office manager
Canada Employment and Immigration (HRSDC and Service Canada), Employment and Insurance, Community Programs, Self-employment program |
juin 1981 à janvier 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
clerk
Correctional Services Canada, Saskatchewan penitentiary |
septembre 1976 à juin 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
clerk
Department of Indian Affairs, Education Branch |
janvier 1974 à juin 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Records Officer
Revenue Canada, Records Management Section |
octobre 1990 à juin 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Records Management Clerk
Revenue Canada, Records Management Section |
mai 1990 à septembre 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk
Canada Revenue, Tax roll |
octobre 1981 à mai 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Client service agent
Veterans Affairs Canada, client services |
août 2004 à novembre 2013 | Pas une charge désignée |
Pension Assistant
Veterans Affairs Canada, Penticton District Office |
mars 2004 à août 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
receptionist
Veterans Affairs Canada, reception Penticton District Office |
mai 2003 à mars 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR3 Records Office Clerk
Department of Finance, Records Management |
1980 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2 Mailroom Clerk
Department of Finance, Mailroom |
1977 à 1979 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
officer
Environment Canada, Weather section |
décembre 2009 à juin 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
agent
Public Works, Health and Safety |
juin 2005 à novembre 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
officer
Public Works, Bien immobiliers |
mai 2003 à mai 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Team leader, collections
Canada Revenue Agency, Taxpayer services and debt management division |
mai 1993 à juin 2012 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR4 Analyst
Canada Post Corporation, Customer Service |
2000 à 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Analyst
Canada Post Corporation, Customer Service |
1994 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS2 Analyst
Canada Post Corporation, Scheduling and Reporting |
1994 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
agent
Human Resources Skills Development, Case Processing Centre Operations |
janvier 1994 à février 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
agent
Human Resources Skills Development, Overpayment recovery |
avril 1987 à janvier 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
agent
Revenue Canada, Reassessing |
octobre 1986 à avril 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
assistant
Canada Employment & Immigration, Employment section |
septembre 1978 à octobre 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
clerk
Fisheries & Oceans, Operations |
février 1978 à juillet 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Officer
National Capital Commission, National Outreach Program |
juillet 1989 à septembre 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
employment counsellor
HRSDC, Employment Unit |
juin 1999 à août 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
clerk
Canada Employment & Immigration, Employment Section |
février 1990 à octobre 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Business Finance Clerk
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2001 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
File Clerk
Human Resources Development Canada, Human Resources |
2000 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR4 Pay and Benefits Clerk
Canada Post Corporation, Pay and Benefits |
1995 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Payroll Clerk
Canada Post Corporation, Payroll |
1991 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administration Clerk
Canada Post Corporation, Administration |
1987 à février 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR4 Assistant to Hearings
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Refugee Commission |
1999 à 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
s/o
Treasury Board, Joint Learning Program |
2001 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
s/o
Treasury Board, Joint Learning Program |
2001 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS3 Financal Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2001 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS3 Financal Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2001 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5 Financial Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2000 à janvier 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5 Financial Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2000 à janvier 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
janvier 1990 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
janvier 1990 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4
Employment and Insurance Canada, Human Resources |
avril 1985 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4
Employment and Insurance Canada, Human Resources |
avril 1985 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Councellor
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment |
1985 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Councellor
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment |
1985 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR 3
Employment & Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR 3
Employment and Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR 3
Employment & Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR 3
Employment and Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Typist
Unemployment Insurance Canada, Insurance |
1977 à 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM3 Coordinator
Revenue Canada, Special Projects/Employment Equity |
1999 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM3 Coordinator
Revenue Canada, Special Projects/Employment Equity |
1999 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Coordinator (PM 3)
Canada Revenue Agency, Corporation Returns Processing |
1995 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Compliance/Refund Enquiries |
1990 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Compliance/Refund Enquiries |
1990 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Corporation Assessing |
1989 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Corporation Assessing |
1989 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Identification Unit |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Identification Unit |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Special Search Unit |
1985 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Special Search Unit |
1985 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS1 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Registry Unit |
1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS1 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Registry Unit |
1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5
Revenue Canada, Registry Units |
janvier 1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5
Revenue Canada, Registry Units |
janvier 1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4
Revenue Canada, File and Retrieval |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4
Revenue Canada, File and Retrieval |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3 Senior Filing Clerk
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3 Senior Filing Clerk
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
field interviewer
SSO, interviewer |
janvier 2000 à mai 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
employer services agent
CCRA, Tax Centre |
janvier 2000 à mai 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Area Councillor
Camp Hill Hospital, Sydney District office |
février 1988 à juillet 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Area councillor
Camp Hill Hospital, entitlement benefits, outpatients section |
1977 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant nurse
Camp Hill Hospital, hospital |
septembre 1976 à février 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
EF03 Retial Food Inspector
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Retail Food, Food Safety |
2002 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM03 Retail Food Inspector
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Retail Food Safety |
2001 à janvier 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS01 Admin Assistant to Regional Director
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Regional Office |
janvier 1998 à janvier 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR04 District Inspection Assistant
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Food Safety |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR04 District Inspection Assistant
Health and Welfare Canada, Health Protection Branch |
1994 à janvier 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
SCY02 Secretary
Health and Welfare Canadaq, Health Protection Branch |
1982 à 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
STN02 Stenographer
Veterans Affairs Canada, Veteran Services |
1981 à janvier 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CX01 Correctional Officer
Correctional Services Canada, Public Security |
janvier 1988 à janvier 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
CX02 Correctional Officer
Correctional Services Canada, Public Security |
1984 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Research technician
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Research Branch |
novembre 1999 à janvier 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Natural Resources Canada, Canadian Forest Service |
juin 1998 à août 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Natural Resources Canada, Canadian Forst Service |
juin 1997 à août 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Natural Resources Canada, Canadian Forest Service |
mai 1996 à août 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR3 Examination Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs, Passport Office |
1997 à 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Production Clerk
Department of Foreign Affairs, Passport Office |
1995 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
reader services assistant
National Gallery of Canada, Library |
juin 1991 à juin 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
clerk
Service Canada, human resources |
février 1998 à juin 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
operations coordinator
Agriculture Canada, Mainland/Interior BC |
avril 2002 à mai 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
meat hygiene inspector
Department of Agriculture, Food inspection directorate |
février 1979 à avril 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
officer
Service Canada, Passport |
août 2010 à juin 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
team leader
Revenue Canada, Taxpayer services and debt management division |
mai 2010 à juin 2012 | Pas une charge désignée |
team leader
Revenue Canada, Business returns division |
avril 2009 à mai 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
collection officer
Revenue Canada, Collections division |
novembre 1999 à avril 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
appeals officer
Revenue Canada, Appeals division |
avril 1995 à novembre 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
rulings officer
Revenue Canada, Collections |
septembre 1994 à avril 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
officer
Revenue Canada, Collections |
mai 1993 à septembre 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Officer
Agriculture Agri Food Canada, Farm income programs directorate |
1991 à 2012 | Pas une charge désignée |