The PSAC aims to unite all workers within its area of jurisdiction into a single organization in order to obtain the best standards of compensation and other conditions of employment for its members and to protect and enhance the rights and interests of all workers.
John Gordon, National President
Adresse :
233 Gilmour Street, Suite 1100
Ottawa, ON K2P 0P1
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-560-4330
Numéro de fax :
613-567-0385
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Public Service Alliance of Canada/Alliance de la Fonction publique du Canada | 2024-04-15 | actuel |
Public Service Alliance of Canada/Alliance de la Fonction publique du Canada | 2008-08-14 | 2024-04-15 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Sharon DeSousa | 2024-06-01 | Actuel |
Chris Aylward | 2019-04-01 | 2024-06-01 |
Robyn Benson | 2012-06-04 | 2018-11-16 |
John Gordon | 2007-02-09 | 2012-06-04 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
AS-3 Chief administrative services
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Administrative services, Montréal District |
juin 1999 à août 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR-5 Analyst
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Client Services |
juin 1998 à juin 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR-4 Finance Officer
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance Section |
janvier 1995 à juin 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR-4 Cleark
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance |
avril 1989 à juin 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM3 Program Operation Consultant
Service Canada, Programs & Services |
2001 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Program Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment Insurance |
1997 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Employment & Insurance Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Unemployment Insurance |
1995 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Service Delivery Representative
Canada Employment & Immigration Canada, Social Insurance Number Registration |
1994 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3 General Clerk
Canada Imployment & Immigration Canada, Social Insurance Number Registration |
1980 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM2
Revenue Canada, Payroll Audit Section |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1
Revenue Canada, Enquiries and Office Examination |
1984 à 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Clerk
Revenue Canada, Assessment Division |
1984 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM3 Unregistered and Non-Resident Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Revenue Collection |
2003 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Unregistered & Non Resident Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Revenue Collection |
2002 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Audit, Benefits Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Revenue Collection |
1995 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Recovery Officer
Revenue Canada, Revenue Collection |
1992 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Recovery Officer
Revenue Canada, Revenue Collection |
1988 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR File Clerk
Veterans Affairs Canada, Central Registry and Medical Benefits |
1982 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM1 Recovery Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Recovery Collection |
1996 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Information Clerk
Service Canada, Security Section |
1992 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk, CR4
Revenue Canada, Client Services |
novembre 1991 à avril 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk, CR4
Revenue Canada, Client Services |
janvier 1991 à avril 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Clerk
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, Fleet Management |
janvier 2001 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Detachment Clerk
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, Rural Detachment |
1994 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Plumber
Public Works Canada, Trades Shop |
février 1974 à février 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM3
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Enforcement Office, Immigration |
2003 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Admission Officer
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Immigration |
janvier 1988 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
AS5 Policy Analyst, Project Officer, AS6 Business Representative for Offender Management System
Correctional Service of Canada, National Headquarters |
décembre 2003 à juin 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
WP4 Parole Officer
Correctional Service of Canada, Edmonton Parole Office |
juin 1995 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parole Officer and WP4 Assistant to Regional Coordinator
Correctional Service Canada, Red Deer Parole Office/Bowden Institution |
octobre 1988 à juin 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Recreation Superviror, Basic Literacy Teacher and Acting Education Coordinator
Government of the Northwest Territories, Yellowknife Correctional Centre |
septembre 1985 à octobre 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Office Manager
Correctional Service of Canada, Yellowknife Parole Office |
juin 1983 à septembre 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3 Clerk
Transport Canada, Human Resources |
août 1982 à juin 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
AS-3 Chief administrative services
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Administrative services, Montréal District |
juin 1999 à août 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR-5 Analyst
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Client Services |
juin 1998 à juin 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR-4 Finance Officer
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance Section |
janvier 1995 à juin 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR-4 Cleark
Department of Veterans' Affairs, Finance |
avril 1989 à juin 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR3 Proof Reader/file clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Collections Div. |
1976 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR 2 Registered Mail Clerk
Revenue Canada, Records Management Division |
1973 à 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PI-4 Supervisor of grain inspectors
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
février 2000 à mai 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PI-5 Supervisor of grain inspectors
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
janvier 2000 à janvier 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Supervisor of grain inspectors
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
mai 1983 à décembre 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
PI-4 Grain Inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
mars 1982 à décembre 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
PI-3 Grain Inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
janvier 1981 à février 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
PI-2 Grain Inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
juin 1978 à janvier 1979 | Pas une charge désignée |
PI-2 Grain Inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
février 1977 à août 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
PI-1 Grain inspector
Canadian Grain Commission, Grain Inspection |
avril 1975 à février 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
s/o
Yukon Territorial Government, Firefighting |
1995 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
s/o
Transport Canada, Airport |
1990 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
s/o
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Forestry |
1983 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
s/o
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Forestry |
1978 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR4 Assistant to Hearings
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Refugee Commission |
1999 à 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Business Finance Clerk
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2001 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
File Clerk
Human Resources Development Canada, Human Resources |
2000 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM2 Special Needs/Women's Councellor
Canada Employment Centre, Employment Centre |
septembre 1978 à août 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Storeperson
Parks Canada, Stores |
1983 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Garbage Truck Driver
Parks, s/o |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Storeperson
Parks Canada, Stores |
1979 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Conservation Corps Superviwor
Parks Canada, s/o |
1977 à 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
Storeperson
Parks Canada, Stores |
1976 à 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Campground Attendant
Parks Canada, s/o |
1975 à 1976 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR3 Filing Clerk
Privy Council, Finance Section |
1991 à janvier 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Finance Clerk
Privy Council, Finance Section |
1991 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Dairy Cattle Inspector
Agriculture Canada, Rate fo Production |
1977 à février 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Clerk
Agriculture Canada, Rate of Production |
1976 à 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR4 Accommodation Clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Assessment |
1993 à 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3 Library Clerk
Fisheries and Oceans, Library |
1992 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Tax Assessment Clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Assessment |
1990 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Accounts Clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Assessment |
1982 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2 File Clerk
Revenue Canada, Accounting and Assessment |
1981 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR4 Pay and Benefits Clerk
Canada Post Corporation, Pay and Benefits |
1995 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Payroll Clerk
Canada Post Corporation, Payroll |
1991 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administration Clerk
Canada Post Corporation, Administration |
1987 à février 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Firefighter
Transport Canada, s/o |
1973 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR3 Records Office Clerk
Department of Finance, Records Management |
1980 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2 Mailroom Clerk
Department of Finance, Mailroom |
1977 à 1979 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
SC-DED-04 Supervisor
Department of National Defence, MARPAC, Queen's Harbour Master at Canadian Forces Base Esquimalt |
septembre 1972 à février 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR4 Analyst
Canada Post Corporation, Customer Service |
2000 à 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS2 Analyst
Canada Post Corporation, Scheduling and Reporting |
1994 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Analyst
Canada Post Corporation, Customer Service |
1994 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CX01 Correctional Officer
Correctional Services Canada, Public Security |
janvier 1988 à janvier 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
CX02 Correctional Officer
Correctional Services Canada, Public Security |
1984 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Mechanic
Department of National Defence, Supply Depot |
mai 1986 à janvier 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Mechanic
Department of National Defence, Workshop Depot |
1981 à mai 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Postal Clerk (no classification at the time)
Canada Post Corporation, Mailroom |
1976 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Customs Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Customs |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Customs Officer
Revenue Canada, Customs |
1991 à 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
GST Registration Officer
Revenue Canada, Customs |
1990 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Customs Officer
Canada Customs, Customs |
1983 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
s/o
Treasury Board, Joint Learning Program |
2001 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS3 Financal Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2001 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
s/o
Treasury Board, Joint Learning Program |
2001 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS3 Financal Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2001 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5 Financial Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2000 à janvier 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5 Financial Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Finance |
2000 à janvier 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
janvier 1990 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment and Insurance |
janvier 1990 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4
Employment and Insurance Canada, Human Resources |
avril 1985 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4
Employment and Insurance Canada, Human Resources |
avril 1985 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Councellor
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment |
1985 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Councellor
Human Resources Development Canada, Employment |
1985 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR 3
Employment and Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR 3
Employment & Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR 3
Employment and Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR 3
Employment & Insurance Canada, Finance |
1978 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Typist
Unemployment Insurance Canada, Insurance |
1977 à 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM3 Coordinator
Revenue Canada, Special Projects/Employment Equity |
1999 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM3 Coordinator
Revenue Canada, Special Projects/Employment Equity |
1999 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Coordinator (PM 3)
Canada Revenue Agency, Corporation Returns Processing |
1995 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Compliance/Refund Enquiries |
1990 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Compliance/Refund Enquiries |
1990 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Corporation Assessing |
1989 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Corporation Assessing |
1989 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Identification Unit |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Identification Unit |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Special Search Unit |
1985 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Special Search Unit |
1985 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS1 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Registry Unit |
1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5
Revenue Canada, Registry Units |
janvier 1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5
Revenue Canada, Registry Units |
janvier 1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS1 Unit Head
Revenue Canada, Registry Unit |
1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4
Revenue Canada, File and Retrieval |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4
Revenue Canada, File and Retrieval |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3 Senior Filing Clerk
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3 Senior Filing Clerk
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Filing and Retrieval |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2
Revenue Canada, Initial Assessing |
1980 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
EF03 Retial Food Inspector
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Retail Food, Food Safety |
2002 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM03 Retail Food Inspector
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Retail Food Safety |
2001 à janvier 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
AS01 Admin Assistant to Regional Director
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Regional Office |
janvier 1998 à janvier 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR04 District Inspection Assistant
Canada Food Inspection Agency, Food Safety |
1997 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR04 District Inspection Assistant
Health and Welfare Canada, Health Protection Branch |
1994 à janvier 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
SCY02 Secretary
Health and Welfare Canadaq, Health Protection Branch |
1982 à 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
STN02 Stenographer
Veterans Affairs Canada, Veteran Services |
1981 à janvier 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR3 Examination Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs, Passport Office |
1997 à 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Production Clerk
Department of Foreign Affairs, Passport Office |
1995 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM3
Canada Post Corporation, Accounts Payable |
1986 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2
Canada Post Corporation, Records Management Finance |
1985 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1
Canada Post Corporation, Stamp Depot |
1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR3
Canada Post Corporation, Mailroom |
1978 à janvier 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
PM2 Technical Resource & Complex Returns Processing Officer
Canada Revenue Agency, Corporate Retuns |
novembre 1991 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM2 Supervisor
Revenue Canada, T1 Adjustments |
1984 à octobre 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR5 Supervisor
Revenue Canada, T1 Adjustments |
1982 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
PM1 T2 Adjustments Officer
Revenue Canada, T2 Adjustments |
juillet 1981 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR4 T1 Adjustment Officer
Revenue Canada, T1 Adjustments |
septembre 1979 à juin 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
CR2-3 Initial Assessing Clerk
Revenue Canada, Assessing |
février 1979 à juin 1979 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
ES4 Research Analyst
Status of Women Canada, s/o |
1995 à 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
ES4 Research Analyst
Canadian Advisory Council, Status of Women Canada, s/o |
1991 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Heating and Power Engineer
Agriculture Canada, Research Station |
1978 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Auditor
Canada Revenue Agency, Audit |
1983 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Audirot
Revenue Canada, Audit |
1982 à février 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Enquiries and Office Examination Officer
Revenue Canada, Enquiries and Office Examination |
1981 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Taxpayer Service Representative
Revenue Canada, Taxpayer Service |
1981 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
EG04
Agriculture Canada, Prairie Farm Rehabilitation Administration |
janvier 1995 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
EG03
Agriculture Canada, Prairie Farm Rehabilitation Administration |
1982 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
EG01 (term employee)
Agriculture Canada, Prairie Farm Rehabilitation Administration |
1981 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
CR5 Analyst
Service Canada, Security Revenue |
1980 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |