Serving customers for 200 years and counting, BMO is a highly diversified financial services provider – the 8th largest bank, by assets, in North America. With total assets of $765 billion as of July 31, 2018, and a team of diverse and highly engaged employees, BMO provides a broad range of personal and commercial banking, wealth management and investment banking products and services to more than 12 million customers and conducts business through three operating groups: Personal and Commercial Banking, BMO Wealth Management and BMO Capital Markets. We serve Canadian clients through BMO Bank of Montreal®, our personal and commercial banking business, BMO Nesbitt Burns®*, one of Canada's leading wealth management firms, and BMO Capital MarketsTM, our North American investment and corporate banking division. In the United States, clients are served through BMO Harris Bank, a major U.S. Midwest personal and commercial bank, and BMO Private Bank, with wealth management offices across the United States, as well as BMO Capital MarketsTM, our North American investment and corporate banking division.
Darryl White, Chief Executive Officer
Adresse :
24th Floor, One First Canadian Place
Toronto, ON M5X 1A1
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
416-867-4711
Numéro de fax :
416-867-5460
BMO Groupe financier / BMO Financial Group n'est pas une filiale d'une société mère.
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
BMO Financial Group/BMO Groupe financier | 2024-05-15 | actuel |
BMO Financial Group/BMO Groupe financier | 2008-07-11 | 2024-05-15 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Darryl White | 2017-11-01 | Actuel |
William Downe | 2007-03-19 | 2017-11-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Member
Office of the Governor General, Order of Canada Advisory Committee |
mars 2006 à juin 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk of the Privy Council, Secretary to the Cabinet and Head of the Public Service of Canada
Public Service of Canada, Privy Council Office |
mars 2006 à juin 2009 | juin 30, 2009 |
Deputy Minister
Department of Finance, Office of the Deputy Minister |
mars 2000 à octobre 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director
Canada Deposit Insurance Corporation, Board of Directors |
mars 2000 à octobre 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director
Bank of Canada, Board of Directors |
mars 2000 à octobre 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Minister
Department of Industry, Office of the Deputy Minister |
octobre 1995 à février 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director
Business Development Bank of Canada, Board of Directors |
octobre 1995 à février 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Associate Deputy Minister
Departmet of Industry, Office of the Deputy Minister |
novembre 1992 à octobre 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |