Established in 1817 as Bank of Montreal, BMO Financial Group (TSX, NYSE: BMO) is a highly diversified financial services organization. With total assets of $542 billion as of January 31, 2013, and more than 46,000 employees, BMO provides a broad range of retail banking, wealth management and investment banking products and solutions. We serve Canadian clients through BMO Bank of Montreal®, our personal and commercial banking business, BMO Nesbitt Burns®*, one of Canada’s leading wealth management firms, and BMO Capital MarketsTM, our North American investment and corporate banking division. In the United States, clients are served through BMO Harris Bank, a major U.S. Midwest personal and commercial bank, and BMO Private Bank, with wealth management offices across the United States, as well as BMO Capital MarketsTM, our North American investment and corporate banking division. On July 5, 2011, BMO announced that it had completed the acquisition of Milwaukee-based Marshall & Ilsley Corporation (M&I). M&I merged with Harris Bank to form BMO Harris Bank N.A., part of BMO Financial Group. This integration was completed on October 8, 2012, and all branches now operate under the name BMO Harris Bank. We help our customers make money make sense by delivering the broadest range of financial services through a single point of contact. Our financial service professionals provide access to any services our customers require across the entire enterprise.
William Downe, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
24th Floor, One First Canadian Place
Toronto, ON M5X 1A1
Canada
Telephone number:
416-867-4711
BMO Financial Group / BMO Groupe financier is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
BMO Financial Group/BMO Groupe financier | 2024-05-15 | current |
BMO Financial Group/BMO Groupe financier | 2008-07-11 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Darryl White | 2017-11-01 | Current |
William Downe | 2007-03-19 | 2017-11-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Clerk of the Privy Council, Secretary to the Cabinet and Head of the Public Service of Canada
Public Service of Canada, Privy Council Office |
March 2006 to June 2009 | June 30, 2009 |
Member
Office of the Governor General, Order of Canada Advisory Committee |
March 2006 to June 2009 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Minister
Department of Finance, Office of the Deputy Minister |
March 2000 to October 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director
Bank of Canada, Board of Directors |
March 2000 to October 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director
Canada Deposit Insurance Corporation, Board of Directors |
March 2000 to October 2004 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Minister
Department of Industry, Office of the Deputy Minister |
October 1995 to February 2000 | Not a designated office |
Director
Business Development Bank of Canada, Board of Directors |
October 1995 to February 2000 | Not a designated office |
Associate Deputy Minister
Departmet of Industry, Office of the Deputy Minister |
November 1992 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |