Distributor of light-duty vehicles, parts and accessories.
Larry Hutchinson, President and CEO
Address:
One Toyota Place
Toronto, ON M1H 1H9
Canada
Telephone number:
416-438-6320
Fax number:
416-431-8373
Toyota Canada Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Toyota Canada Inc. | 2024-04-01 | current |
Toyota Canada Inc. | 2008-07-02 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Larry Hutchinson | 2016-01-01 | Current |
Seiji Ichii | 2012-01-02 | 2016-01-01 |
Yoichi Tomihara | 2007-03-27 | 2012-01-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Legislative |
May 2020 to November 2020 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Legislative |
April 2018 to April 2019 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Support staff for Member of Cabinet, Office of the Attorney general of canada |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Support staff for Member of Cabinet, Office of the President of the Queen's Privy Council |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Head, House Business
Support staff Member of Cabinet, Office of the President of the Queen's Privy Council |
1984 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Support staff for Member of Parliament, Office of the Opposition house leader |
1982 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
Support staff for member of Parliament, Office of the Member of Parliament for Grey Bruce |
1979 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Legislative |
May 2020 to November 2020 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Legislative |
April 2018 to April 2019 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant / Senior Special Assistant
Ministry of the Environment, Office of the Minister |
August 2014 to December 2015 | December 4, 2015 |
Project Assistant
Industry Canada, Corporations Canada |
May 2010 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |