Siemens is one of the largest and most diversified companies in the world of electronics and electrical engineering, operating in the industry, energy and healthcare sectors. Siemens in Canada has approximately 5,000 employees in Canada. Sales for fiscal 2010 (ended September 30), were $2.3 billion CDN.
Robert Hardt, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-09-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Invest NB | $24,181.00 | Yes |
Ontario Ministry of Economic Development and Trade | $48,311.47 | Yes |
Address:
1577 North Service Road East
Oakville, ON L6H 0H6
Canada
Telephone number:
905-465-8100
Fax number:
905-465-7100
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Siemens Canada Limited/Siemens Canada Limitee | 2024-05-14 | current |
Siemens Canada Limited/Siemens Canada Limitee | 2008-09-12 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Faisal Kazi | 2017-09-01 | Current |
Bo Ouyang | 2017-06-01 | 2017-09-01 |
Robert Hardt | 2012-01-01 | 2017-06-01 |
Roland Aurich | 2009-05-01 | 2012-01-01 |
Manfred Doenz | 2009-02-01 | 2009-05-01 |
Guenther R. Scholz | 2007-02-26 | 2009-02-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
National Director Advocacy and Partnerships Directorate
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Socio- Economic Policy and Programs Sector, Economic Development Branch |
March 2003 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
National Director Aboriginal Workforce Participation Initiative
Directorate, Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Socio- Economic Policy and Programs Sector, Economic Development Branch |
March 2001 to February 2003 | Not a designated office |
National Career Councellor
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Corporate Services Sector,, Human Resources Branch,Leadership and Developement Directorate |
January 2000 to February 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consul General in Detroit (United States of America)
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Consulate |
August 2002 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director of Investment Partnerships Canada
Industry Canada and the Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Investment Partnerships Canada |
1996 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Director General and Manager, Forest Industries and Building Products, and Functional Adviser for Trade
Industry Canada, Forest Industries and Building Products |
1995 to 1996 | Not a designated office |