THE CHAMBER OF MARINE COMMERCE MONITORS AND ADVOCATES ON TRADE AND TRANSPORTATION STATUTE, POLICY AND REGULATIONS, PARTICULARLY THOSE DEALING WITH THE MARINE MODE AS THEY MAY AFFECT MEMBER COMPANIES. CHAMBER STAFF WORK WITH MEMBERS AND DEVELOP POSITIONS WHICH THEY THEN RELATE TO GOVERNMENT OFFICIALS. CHAMBER STAFF ARRANGE AND PARTICIPATE IN MEETINGS BETWEEN REPRESENTATIVES OF MEMBER COMPANIES AND GOVERNMENT OFFICIALS.
BRUCE BURROWS, PRESIDENT AND CEO
Address:
300 Sparks Street
Suite 340
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S3
Canada
Telephone number:
613-294-6603
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Chamber of Marine Commerce/Chambre de commerce maritime | 2024-05-02 | current |
Chamber of Marine Commerce/Chambre de commerce maritime | 2008-04-23 | 2024-05-02 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
BRUCE BURROWS | 2016-12-09 | Current |
RAYMOND JOHNSTON | 2016-10-01 | 2016-12-09 |
STEPHEN BROOKS | 2013-04-01 | 2016-10-01 |
RAYMOND JOHNSTON | 1999-12-14 | 2013-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Press Secretary (Ontario)
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
January 2013 to September 2013 | Not a designated office |
Press Secretary (Ontario) - Acting
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
October 2012 to December 2012 | Not a designated office |
Communications Officer - Writer
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
February 2012 to September 2012 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Jamie Nicholls, MP |
July 2011 to February 2012 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Judy Wasylycia-Leis, MP |
March 2010 to March 2010 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Office of John Rafferty, MP |
September 2008 to March 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Press Secretary (Ontario)
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
January 2013 to September 2013 | Not a designated office |
Press Secretary (Ontario) - Acting
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
October 2012 to December 2012 | Not a designated office |
Communications Officer - Writer
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
February 2012 to September 2012 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Jamie Nicholls, MP |
July 2011 to February 2012 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Judy Wasylycia-Leis, MP |
March 2010 to March 2010 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Office of John Rafferty, MP |
September 2008 to March 2011 | Not a designated office |