AstraZeneca Canada is the 2nd largest research-based pharmaceutical company in Canada. Our unique combination of curiosity and a fundamental commitment to patient health are the key drivers of research and development. Looking beyond the obvious and solving problems innovatively enables our scientists and the researchers we support to discover new and better treatments for a wide array of medical conditions and diseases. In Canada, we invest over CDN$2 million each and every week on research initiatives. Most of our 1,400 Canadian employees work at our high-tech facility in Mississauga, Ontario, headquarters for packaging, clinical research, sales and marketing, and distribution. Over 125 scientists work at our world-class basic pain research centre in Montréal, Québec. AstraZeneca Research & Development Montréal (AZRDM) is a leader in pain control research, focusing primarily on the mechanisms involved in inflammatory and neuropathic pain, the two most common types of chronic pain. Our innovative and extensive product portfolio spans six therapeutic areas: cardiovascular, gastrointestinal, oncology, respiratory, neuroscience and infection.
Mark Jones, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
1004 Middlegate Road
Mississauga, ON L4Y 1M4
Canada
Telephone number:
905-566-7323
AstraZeneca Canada Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
AstraZeneca Canada Inc. | 2024-04-30 | current |
AstraZeneca Canada Inc. | 2008-07-31 | 2024-04-30 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Gaby Bourbara | 2024-03-01 | Current |
Kiersten Combs | 2021-09-01 | 2024-03-01 |
Jane Chung | 2019-11-01 | 2021-09-01 |
Daniel Smedley | 2019-08-01 | 2019-11-01 |
Jamie Freedman | 2017-11-28 | 2019-08-01 |
Ed Dybka | 2015-01-02 | 2017-11-28 |
Elaine Campbell | 2012-01-09 | 2015-01-02 |
Marion McCourt | 2010-04-12 | 2012-01-09 |
Mark Jones | 2007-03-08 | 2010-04-12 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Advisor
Minister of Justice and Attorney General of Canada, The Honourable Allan Rock, Q.C., P.C., M.P. |
1995 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, William C. Graham, Q.C. |
1993 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant and Special Assistant for Parliamentary Affairs & Communications
House of Commons, Belinda Stronach, M.P. |
2004 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Grant McNally, M.P. |
1999 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Researcher
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Preston Manning, M.P. |
1997 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Advisor
Minister of Justice and Attorney General of Canada, The Honourable Allan Rock, Q.C., P.C., M.P. |
1995 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, William C. Graham, Q.C. |
1993 to 1995 | Not a designated office |