Promote an understanding of the Canadian banking industry, work with others to ensure the legal and regulatory framework governing banks operates in an effecient and effective manner, and help in the development of industry standards.
Angelina Mason, Interim Chief Executive Officer and General Counsel
Address:
199 Bay Street
Commerce Court West
Toronto, ON M5L 1G2
Canada
Telephone number:
416-362-6092
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Bankers Association/Association des Banquiers Canadiens | 2024-04-02 | current |
Canadian Bankers Association/Association des Banquiers Canadiens | 2008-07-25 | 2024-04-02 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Anthony Ostler | 2022-02-28 | Current |
Angelina Mason | 2021-12-23 | 2022-02-28 |
Neil Parmenter | 2017-05-01 | 2021-12-23 |
Terry Campbell | 2011-03-01 | 2017-05-01 |
Nancy Hughes Anthony | 2007-05-30 | 2011-03-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Officer
Public Safety Canada, Public Affairs and Communications |
January 2010 to February 2010 | Not a designated office |
Ministerial Communications Liaison
Public Safety Canada, Public Affairs and Communications |
May 2008 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Advisor
House of Commons, House of Commons |
November 2015 to March 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
Office of the Senator Catherin Callbeck, Senate of Canada |
October 2012 to July 2014 | Not a designated office |
Student
Office of Senator Eggleton, Senate of Canada |
September 2011 to March 2012 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Office of Senator Eggleton, Senate of Canada |
May 2011 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Office of Senator Eggleton, Senate of Canada |
May 2010 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Ops Support Manager
Canadian Security Intelligence Service, Data Management and Exploitation |
July 2016 to July 2019 | Not a designated office |
Operations Manager
Canadian Security Intelligence Service, Scientific and Technical Services |
July 2015 to June 2016 | Not a designated office |
Student, National Security Programme
Canadian Security Intelligence Service (Secondment to the Department of National Defence), Canadian Forces College |
August 2014 to June 2015 | Not a designated office |
Operations Manager
Canadian Security Intelligence Service, Counter Terrorism Branch |
August 2011 to July 2014 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Immigration Screening
Canadian Security Intelligence Service, Security Screening Branch |
August 2008 to July 2011 | Not a designated office |
Military Intelligence Officer (Reserve)
Canadian Forces, Land Forces Central Area Headquarter / 2 Intelligence Company |
August 1994 to July 2008 | Not a designated office |
Intelligence Officer / Supervisor / Chief
Canadian Security Intelligence Service, Toronto Region |
January 1994 to July 2008 | Not a designated office |
Intelligence Officer
Canadian Security Intelligence Service, Counter Terrorism, HQ |
January 1991 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Military Intelligence Officer (Reserve)
Canadian Forces, Central Area Headquarter |
1990 to January 1991 | Not a designated office |
Infantry Officer – Reserve Entry Scheme Officer Program
Canadian Forces, The Toronto Scottish Regiment |
1983 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Strategic Planning and Performance Measurement
Office of the Superintendent of Financial Institutions, Office of the Superintendent of Financial Institutions |
June 2004 to November 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Treasury Board Secretariat, Corporate Governance Directorate |
July 2006 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant - Canadian Food Inspection Agency
Minister of Agriculture and Agri-food Canada, Minister's Office |
September 2005 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament |
September 2001 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Policy Intern
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Canadian Mission to the Organization of American States (OAS) |
September 1999 to December 1999 | Not a designated office |