NON-PROFIT ASSOCIATION REPRESENTING CANADIAN COMPANIES INVOLVED IN THE REFINING, DISTRIBUTING &/OR MARKETING OF PETROLEUM PRODUCTS. CONDUCTS RESEARCH TO DEVELOP INDUSTRY POLICY ON HEALTH, SAFETY, ENVIRONMENTAL AND BUSINESS ISSUES. ACTIVITIES INCLUDE: ESTABLISHING ENVIRONMENTAL POLICIES; DEVELOPING GUIDELINES FOR THE SAFE HANDLING OF PETROLEUM PRODUCTS; PROVIDING INFORMATION ON INDUSTRY ACTIVITIES TO THE PUBLIC; AND DEVELOPING WORKING RELATIONSHIPS WITH GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC INTEREST GROUPS TO ADDRESS ISSUES OF COMMON CONCERN.
Peter Boag, President
Address:
1000 - 275 SLATER STREET
OTTAWA, ON K1P 5H9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-232-3709
Fax number:
613-236-4280
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Fuels Association/Association canadienne des carburants | 2024-05-01 | current |
Canadian Fuels Association/Association canadienne des carburants | 2012-10-02 | 2024-05-01 |
Canadian Petroleum Products Institute/Institut canadien des produits pétroliers | 2008-09-04 | 2012-10-02 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bob Larocque | 2020-09-08 | Current |
Peter Boag | 2007-08-02 | 2020-09-08 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff to Honourable John Manley
Federal Government, Office of the Deputy Prime Minister and Department of Finance |
2002 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff to Honourable John Manley
Federal Government, Foreign Affairs and International Trade |
2000 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff to Honourable John Manley
Federal Government, Department of Industry |
1993 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant to John Manley, MP
Federal Government, Member of Parliament |
1989 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief
Canadian Transportation Accident Investigation & Safety Board, Air Investigation Operations |
March 1990 to November 1992 | Not a designated office |
Chief
Canadian Aviation Safety Board, Invetigation Operations |
September 1984 to March 1990 | Not a designated office |
Inspector
Transport Canada, Aviation Safety Bureau |
February 1982 to September 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff to Honourable John Manley
Federal Government, Office of the Deputy Prime Minister and Department of Finance |
2002 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff to Honourable John Manley
Federal Government, Foreign Affairs and International Trade |
2000 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff to Honourable John Manley
Federal Government, Department of Industry |
1993 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant to John Manley, MP
Federal Government, Member of Parliament |
1989 to 1993 | Not a designated office |