Total Number of Communication Reports: 867
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Shaw Communications Inc. is a diversified Canadian communications company whose core business is providing broadband cable television, Internet, Digital Phone, telecommunications services (through Big Pipe Inc.) and satellite direct-to-home services (through Shaw Direct) to approximately 3.0 million customers. Shaw is traded on the Toronto and New York stock exchanges and is a member of the S&P/TSX 60 index (Symbol: TSX - SJR.NV.B, NYSE - SJR).
Brad Shaw, CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-08-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Industry Canada | $969,229.00 | No |
Address:
40 Elgin Street, #1400
Ottawa, ON K1P 5K6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-688-6751
Fax number:
613-688-6799
Shaw Communications is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Shaw Communications | 2008-08-15 | 2023-04-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Brad Shaw | 2011-07-18 | 2023-04-03 |
Peter Bissonnette | 2007-08-03 | 2011-07-18 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Competition Law Officer
Competition Bureau, Mergers Branch |
2002 to March 2004 | Not a designated office |
Commerce Officer
Competition Bureau, Compliance and Operations Branch |
February 1998 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legal Council
CRTC, Legal Directorate |
February 2005 to September 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Trade Development Officer
Canadian Heritage, Trade and Investment |
September 2000 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Trade Development Officer
Canadian Heritage, Trade and Investment |
April 1999 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief Policy Advisor to the Chair
CRTC, Office of the Chair |
1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Manager
CRTC, New Media and Competition Policy |
1995 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Manager
CRTC, Distribution & Technology |
1990 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst
CRTC, Cable, Pay and Specialty Services |
1988 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst
CRTC, Radio Policy |
1985 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
CRTC, Research |
1984 to 1985 | Not a designated office |